ETTARO v. CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE
Plaintiff: SAMUEL ANTHONY ETTARO, II
Defendant: CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE
Case Number: 2:2020cv01400
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Upon consideration of the parties' Stipulation it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this action is remanded to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, Pennsylvania.The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case for statistical and all other purposes. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/30/2020. (bjl) Modified on 10/27/2020 (cel).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Benjamin Sorisio terminated. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/30/2020. (bjl)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO REMAND by CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Monahan, Patricia)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sorisio, Benjamin)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jgb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/29/2020. (jgb)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia A. Monahan on behalf of CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE. (Monahan, Patricia)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 ERROR: ATTORNEYS ARE FROM DIFFERENT FIRMS; WRONG EVENT/DOCUMENT; ATTORNEY WAS ADVISED VIA TELEPHONE; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; NOTICE of Consent Filing Order Granting Substitution of Attorney as to California Casualty Indemnity Exchange by CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE. (Monahan, Patricia) Modified on 9/23/2020 (cel).
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Court of Common, case number G.D. 20-007569 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5916618), filed by CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ETTARO v. CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE
Represented By: Benjamin Sorisio
Represented By: Patricia A. Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL ANTHONY ETTARO, II
Represented By: Ryan R Jablonski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?