CLP ASSOCIATES, LLC v. SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Plaintiff: CLP ASSOCIATES, LLC
Defendant: SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01409
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: W Scott Hardy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER indicating that, in accordance with #9 the Memorandum Opinion filed this day, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. 1-2) is DENIED. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 10/13/20. (kw)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. 1-2) is DENIED. See Memorandum Opinion for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 10/13/20. (kw)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY BRIEF re #1 Notice of Removal, (Motion for Preliminary Injunction) filed by CLP ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ernie Spader with Photos) (Lipkin, Brian)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF in Opposition to #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibit 2 [Doc. 1-2], Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Meyers, Matthew)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Status Conference held on 09/21/2020 before Judge W. Scott Hardy. Court Reporter Deborah Ann Betzler, Telephone number 412-330-1365. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 9/30/2020. Redaction Request due 10/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2020. (dab) Modified on 10/1/2020 (jd). Modified on 10/28/2020 (jd). Modified on 10/30/2020 (jd).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule indicating that Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. 1-2) is due by 9/25/20 and Plaintiff's Reply, if any, is due by 9/30/20. The transcript of the telephone conference of counsel held on 9/21/20 shall be produced on an expedited basis with costs to be borne by Defendant. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 9/21/20. (kw)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge W. Scott Hardy: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/21/20. (Court Reporter: Deborah Betzler) (kw)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER indicating that a Telephone Conference of Counsel is set for 9/21/20 at 9:30 AM before Judge W. Scott Hardy. The Court's law clerk will circulate dial-in information for the call. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 9/18/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kw)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF JEFFERSON COUNTY, case number 2020-00687 with BOTH Copies attached: LOWER COURT COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS, NOTICE TO DEFEND, MOTIONS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5921073), filed by SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLP ASSOCIATES, LLC v. SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SENECA INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Matthew A. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLP ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: Brian D. Lipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?