SNYDER v. DAVIDSON
Plaintiff: SHAWNNA SNYDER
Defendant: MARY E. DAVIDSON
Case Number: 2:2020cv01487
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Referring Judge: Christy Criswell Wiegand
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M Young on behalf of MARY E. DAVIDSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Young, Daniel)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/2/2020. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 11/19/2020. (jmm)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SHAWNNA SNYDER. MARY E. DAVIDSON served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Frost, Eric)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. Signed by Christy Criswell Wiegand on 10/26/2020. (jmm)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Christy Criswell Wiegand for all further proceedings. Judge Arthur J. Schwab no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:20-mc-1451. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 10/22/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sgn)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MARY E. DAVIDSON (ma)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/5/20. (ms)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by SHAWNNA SNYDER (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Frost, Eric)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARY E. DAVIDSON (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5957852), filed by SHAWNNA SNYDER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNYDER v. DAVIDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWNNA SNYDER
Represented By: Eric M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY E. DAVIDSON
Represented By: Daniel M Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?