MITSUBISHI ELECTRICAL POWER PRODUCTS, INC. v. ELECTRICAL POWER SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Plaintiff: MITSUBISHI ELECTRICAL POWER PRODUCTS, INC.
Defendant: ELECTRICAL POWER SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01523
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Aaron Carroll on behalf of MITSUBISHI ELECTRICAL POWER PRODUCTS, INC.. (Carroll, Joseph)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/25/2020; Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 12/2/2020 at 09:30 AM via Telephone Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (bjl)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by ELECTRICAL POWER SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Grimsley, Douglas)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ELECTRICAL POWER SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Grimsley, Douglas)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Michael Grimsley on behalf of ELECTRICAL POWER SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Grimsley, Douglas)
October 14, 2020 Judge Marilyn J. Horan presiding. (nll)
October 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge no longer assigned to case. (nll)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Muha on behalf of ELECTRICAL POWER SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Muha, Michael)
October 13, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 10/20/2020. (ept)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number 20-009752 Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5980443), filed by ELECTRICAL POWER SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MITSUBISHI ELECTRICAL POWER PRODUCTS, INC. v. ELECTRICAL POWER SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTRICAL POWER SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Michael A. Muha
Represented By: Douglas Michael Grimsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MITSUBISHI ELECTRICAL POWER PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Joseph Aaron Carroll
Represented By: Chad I. Michaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?