WRIGHT BROTHERS INC. et al v. MCKENNA
Plaintiff: WRIGHT BROTHERS INC. and W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC.
Defendant: HEATHER MCKENNA
Case Number: 2:2020cv01542
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against WRIGHT BROTHERS INC. by HEATHER MCKENNA. (Elzer, Christine)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that a Preliminary Telephone Conference is scheduled for October 22, 2020 at 11:00 AM. All participants shall call into the conference by dialing 888-363-4749 and entering the access code 6019141. If asked for a security code, use '*' to bypass. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/14/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than November 4, 2020. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Any party who has filed a Consent to Trial by a Magistrate Judge or District Judge form does not need to refile it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela W. Connelly on behalf of W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC., WRIGHT BROTHERS INC.. (Connelly, Pamela)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/14/2020. (jmb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine T. Elzer on behalf of HEATHER MCKENNA. (Elzer, Christine)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaver, case number 2020-10908 with jury demand Copies attached: state court record (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5984940), filed by HEATHER MCKENNA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT BROTHERS INC. et al v. MCKENNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WRIGHT BROTHERS INC.
Represented By: Pamela W. Connelly
Represented By: Harry F. Kunselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.D. WRIGHT CONTRACTING, INC.
Represented By: Pamela W. Connelly
Represented By: Harry F. Kunselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER MCKENNA
Represented By: Rachel L McElroy
Represented By: Christine T. Elzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?