POWELL v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Plaintiff: RICHARD W. POWELL, JR.
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Case Number: 2:2020cv01565
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION certification of Tax Clinic by RICHARD W. POWELL, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion) (Barill, Michael)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Michael W. Barill to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This order has no bearing on the potential admission of students, which is governed under Local Rule 83.2.D. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/23/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cyk)
November 23, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (jjg)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Michael W. Barill to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6103890) by RICHARD W. POWELL, JR. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit) (Barill, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, filed by RICHARD W. POWELL, JR. (Barill, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 10/19/20. (jhi)
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (ept)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-6000432), filed by RICHARD W. POWELL, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POWELL v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD W. POWELL, JR.
Represented By: Michael W Barill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?