THELEN v. THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN THELEN
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, DEBRA FITZSIMMONS, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION, SUSANNA SINK and DEBRA FITZSIMONS
Case Number: 2:2020cv01717
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SUSANNA SINK, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION, DEBRA FITZSIMONS, MICHAEL DRISCOLL. SUSANNA SINK waiver sent on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/12/2021; INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA waiver sent on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/12/2021; THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION waiver sent on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/12/2021; DEBRA FITZSIMMONS waiver sent on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/12/2021; MICHAEL DRISCOLL waiver sent on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Simkin, Sarah)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J. Simkin on behalf of MICHAEL DRISCOLL, DEBRA FITZSIMONS, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, SUSANNA SINK, THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Simkin, Sarah)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL DRISCOLL, DEBRA FITZSIMONS, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, SUSANNA SINK, THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (ma)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL DRISCOLL, DEBRA FITZSIMMONS, INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, SUSANNA SINK, THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-6068504), filed by KEVIN THELEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THELEN v. THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Sarah J. Simkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA FITZSIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL DRISCOLL
Represented By: Sarah J. Simkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By: Sarah J. Simkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSANNA SINK
Represented By: Sarah J. Simkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA FITZSIMONS
Represented By: Sarah J. Simkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN THELEN
Represented By: James B. Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?