JENKINS v. GIRL'S HOPE OF PITTSBURGH, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DAWN JENKINS
Defendant: SHANNON C. LEBAK, GIRL'S HOPE OF PITTSBURGH, INC., SR. ELAINE SCHINDLER, PRIMARY HEALTH NETWORK, LISA TEDDE, JENNIFER HEID and M.D. NASIM SHAJIHAN
Case Number: 2:2020cv01762
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: W Scott Hardy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Substitute Party and Motion to Dismiss.Plaintiff's Response due by 2/8/2021. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 1/7/21. (kas)
January 6, 2021 Filing 22 Second MOTION to Extend Time to FILE RESPONSE by DAWN JENKINS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Torrence, Albert)
December 28, 2020 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GIRL'S HOPE OF PITTSBURGH, INC.. (Adkins, Meghan)
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by GIRL'S HOPE OF PITTSBURGH, INC., JENNIFER HEID, ELAINE SCHINDLER, LISA TEDDE. (Rosenberg, David)
December 21, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #20 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 12/28/2020. (sdp)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to Removal and to File Response to Motion to Substitute Party and Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file her Response to the Motion for Substitution of Party, and her Response to the Motion to Dismiss, on or before 1/8/21. Plaintiff may additionally file a motion for remand pursuant to and within the time frames required by 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1447(c). Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 12/9/20. (kas)
December 8, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Merit Nasim Shajihan, MD by Albert A. Torrence on behalf of DAWN JENKINS (Torrence, Albert)
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Merit Shannon Lebak by Albert A. Torrence on behalf of DAWN JENKINS (Torrence, Albert)
December 8, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Merit Primary Health Network by Albert A. Torrence on behalf of DAWN JENKINS (Torrence, Albert)
December 8, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #15 Motion to Extend Time. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp)
December 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Extend Time to Object to Removal by DAWN JENKINS. (Torrence, Albert)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #10 Defendants' Motion for Substitution of Party. Plaintiff's Response due by 12/8/2020. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 11/25/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support re #12 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by SHANNON C. LEBAK, PRIMARY HEALTH NETWORK, NASIM SHAJIHAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Fischer, Adam)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SHANNON C. LEBAK, PRIMARY HEALTH NETWORK, NASIM SHAJIHAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fischer, Adam)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support re #10 Motion to Substitute Party filed by SHANNON C. LEBAK, PRIMARY HEALTH NETWORK, NASIM SHAJIHAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Fischer, Adam)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Substitute Party by SHANNON C. LEBAK, PRIMARY HEALTH NETWORK, NASIM SHAJIHAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fischer, Adam)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Answer due by 12/23/20. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 11/20/20. (kas)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this document. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (dms)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 Errata re #5 Notice of Appearance of C. Shawn Dryer by DAWN JENKINS. Reason for Correction: Inadvertently included unnecessary pages.. (Dryer, C.)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Shawn Dryer on behalf of DAWN JENKINS. (Dryer, C.) Error: document contained unnecessary pages. Document removed public view. See #6 Errata. Modified on 11/20/2020. (tt)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Rosenberg on behalf of GIRL'S HOPE OF PITTSBURGH, INC., JENNIFER HEID, ELAINE SCHINDLER, LISA TEDDE. (Rosenberg, David)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by GIRL'S HOPE OF PITTSBURGH, INC., JENNIFER HEID, ELAINE SCHINDLER, LISA TEDDE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Adkins, Meghan)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan K. Adkins on behalf of GIRL'S HOPE OF PITTSBURGH, INC., JENNIFER HEID, ELAINE SCHINDLER, LISA TEDDE. (Adkins, Meghan)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaver County, case number 11218-2018 with jury demand Copies attached: state court record (), filed by NASIM SHAJIHAN, PRIMARY HEALTH NETWORK, SHANNON C. LEBAK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JENKINS v. GIRL'S HOPE OF PITTSBURGH, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANNON C. LEBAK
Represented By: Adam Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIRL'S HOPE OF PITTSBURGH, INC.
Represented By: David J. Rosenberg
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SR. ELAINE SCHINDLER
Represented By: David J. Rosenberg
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIMARY HEALTH NETWORK
Represented By: Adam Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA TEDDE
Represented By: David J. Rosenberg
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER HEID
Represented By: David J. Rosenberg
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. NASIM SHAJIHAN
Represented By: Adam Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN JENKINS
Represented By: Albert A. Torrence
Represented By: C. Shawn Dryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?