THOMAS v. ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK et al
Plaintiff: JANE THOMAS
Defendant: ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM and FORBES HOSPITAL
Case Number: 2:2020cv01796
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 CORRECTIVE ENTRY re #8 Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order. Extra page at the end of original order. (kly)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2021 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 1/28/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/4/2021. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 2/4/2021. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 1/7/2021. (kly) Document removed from public view and redocketed as a Corrected Entry at #9 Modified on 1/7/2021 (lar).
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM. WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM waiver sent on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (McGrogan, Mariah)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FORBES HOSPITAL. FORBES HOSPITAL waiver sent on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (McGrogan, Mariah)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK. ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK waiver sent on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (McGrogan, Mariah)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariah H. McGrogan on behalf of ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK, FORBES HOSPITAL, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM. (McGrogan, Mariah)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine S. Ryan on behalf of ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK, FORBES HOSPITAL, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM. (Ryan, Catherine)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Forbes on behalf of JANE THOMAS. (Forbes, Chelsea)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK, FORBES HOSPITAL, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-6099251), filed by JANE THOMAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS v. ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE THOMAS
Represented By: Lawrence D. Kerr
Represented By: Chelsea N Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK
Represented By: Mariah H. McGrogan
Represented By: Catherine S. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Mariah H. McGrogan
Represented By: Catherine S. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORBES HOSPITAL
Represented By: Mariah H. McGrogan
Represented By: Catherine S. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?