THOMAS et al v. WESTMORELAND COUNTY
Plaintiff: MARK THOMAS, CHARLES E. THOMAS and MARSHA HALL
Defendant: WESTMORELAND COUNTY doing business as WESTMORELAND MANOR
Case Number: 2:2020cv01903
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: W Scott Hardy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support re #6 Motion to Dismiss per FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) filed by WESTMORELAND COUNTY. (Williott, Anthony)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 12(b)(6) by WESTMORELAND COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
January 8, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Waiver of Service Executed. ERROR: Wrong date used for service date. CORRECTION: corrected service date to 12/9/2020 which makes ANSWER DUE DATE TO 2/6/2021. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHARLES E. THOMAS, MARSHA HALL, MARK THOMAS. WESTMORELAND COUNTY waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/6/2021. (Petrunya, Max) Modified on 1/8/2021 (jv).
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Williott on behalf of WESTMORELAND COUNTY. (Williott, Anthony)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this document. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (dms)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WESTMORELAND COUNTY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6142099), filed by CHARLES E. THOMAS, MARSHA HALL, MARK THOMAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS et al v. WESTMORELAND COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK THOMAS
Represented By: Max Petrunya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES E. THOMAS
Represented By: Max Petrunya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARSHA HALL
Represented By: Max Petrunya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTMORELAND COUNTY doing business as WESTMORELAND MANOR
Represented By: Anthony J. Williott
Represented By: Christopher Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?