MORTON-ROZIER v. GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Plaintiff: KORIE MORTON-ROZIER
Defendant: GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT and PAUL CALIARI
Case Number: 2:2021cv00003
Filed: January 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 43 Proposed Order re #10 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Cavrich, Joseph)
February 24, 2021 Filing 42 Sur-Reply Brief re #36 Sur-Reply Brief, #41 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by KORIE MORTON-ROZIER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hollis, Todd)
February 24, 2021 Filing 41 BRIEF in Support re #37 Motion for Leave to File, Join In Defendant Gateway School District's Sur-Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by PAUL CALIARI. (Luvara, Joseph)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to File Sur Reply. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/24/2021. (kly)
February 23, 2021 Filing 39 First MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply by KORIE MORTON-ROZIER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hollis, Todd)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to Join in Defendant Gateway School District's Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/23/2021. (kly)
February 22, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Join in Defendant Gateway School District's #36 Sur-Reply Brief re #32 Brief in Opposition Filed by Defendants by PAUL CALIARI. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Luvara, Joseph)
February 20, 2021 Filing 36 Sur-Reply Brief re #32 Brief in Opposition to Motion, filed by GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Cavrich, Joseph)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to the District's Motion to Dismiss. Reply due by 2/22/2021. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/18/2021. (kly)
February 17, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bittner, Salvatore)
February 16, 2021 Filing 33 BRIEF in Opposition re #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by KORIE MORTON-ROZIER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hollis, Todd)
February 15, 2021 Filing 32 BRIEF in Opposition re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by KORIE MORTON-ROZIER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hollis, Todd)
February 12, 2021 Filing 31 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hollis, Todd)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Preserve Evidence as more fully set forth in the body of the Order. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/11/21. (jmc)
February 4, 2021 Filing 29 Sur-Reply Brief re #18 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Cavrich, Joseph)
February 1, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy J. Brinkos on behalf of PAUL CALIARI. (Brinkos, Amy)
February 1, 2021 Filing 27 Errata re #22 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by PAUL CALIARI. Reason for Correction: attorney signature. (Luvara, Joseph)
February 1, 2021 Filing 26 Errata re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PAUL CALIARI. Reason for Correction: attorney signature. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Luvara, Joseph) Modified on 2/2/2021 to link to appropriate document (jv).
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 2/22/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/1/2021. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 3/1/2021. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/1/2021. (kly)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #22 Brief in Support of Motion. Response to Motion due by 3/1/2021. Reply may be filed by 3/14/2021. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/1/2021. (kly)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #20 Brief in Support of Motion. Response to Motion due by 3/1/2021. Reply may be filed by 3/14/2021. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/1/2021. (kly)
February 1, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #22 Brief in Support of Motion. ERROR: Signature on documents and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event and linking to respective entry. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
January 29, 2021 Filing 22 BRIEF in Support re #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PAUL CALIARI. (Luvara, Joseph)
January 29, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PAUL CALIARI. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Luvara, Joseph)
January 29, 2021 Filing 20 BRIEF in Support re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Cavrich, Joseph)
January 29, 2021 Filing 19 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cavrich, Joseph)
January 28, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #17 Response to Motion, #16 Response to Motion filed by KORIE MORTON-ROZIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Hollis, Todd)
January 25, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION Preserve Evidence filed by PAUL CALIARI. (Luvara, Joseph)
January 25, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION Preserve Evidence filed by GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Cavrich, Joseph)
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 BRIEF in Opposition re #10 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2020.12.15 Correspondence from Atty. Hollis) (Cavrich, Joseph)
January 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
January 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L. Luvara on behalf of PAUL CALIARI. (Luvara, Joseph)
January 13, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #8 Summons/Returned Returned Executed, #9 Summons/Returned Returned Executed. ERROR: Incorrect service date used for service. CORRECTION: corrected service date to 1/8/2021 which makes ANSWER DUE DATE OF 1/29/2021. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #10 Motion to Preserve Evidence and #11 Brief in Support of Motion. Defendants' Response to Motion due by 1/25/2021. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 1/12/2021. (kly)
January 10, 2021 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support re #10 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Preservation of Evidence filed by KORIE MORTON-ROZIER. (Hollis, Todd)
January 10, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION Preserve Evidence by KORIE MORTON-ROZIER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hollis, Todd)
January 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KORIE MORTON-ROZIER. PAUL CALIARI served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Hollis, Todd) Modified on 1/13/2021 to change service date to date indicated on return.
January 9, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KORIE MORTON-ROZIER. GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Hollis, Todd) Modified on 1/13/2021 to change service date to date indicated on return. (jv).
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to PAUL CALIARI (Main Document), GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Gateway School District) (jv)
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 Errata re #3 Praecipe to Issue Summons by KORIE MORTON-ROZIER. Reason for Correction: We mistakenly omitted attaching the corresponding summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Hollis, Todd)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Salvatore Bittner on behalf of GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Bittner, Salvatore)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Cavrich on behalf of GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Cavrich, Joseph)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by KORIE MORTON-ROZIER (Hollis, Todd)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 Errata re #1 Complaint Reason for Correction: Computer Malfunction populating all fields of form. (jv)
January 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul CALIARI, GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6207031), filed by KORIE MORTON-ROZIER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORTON-ROZIER v. GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GATEWAY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Joseph W. Cavrich
Represented By: Salvatore Bittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL CALIARI
Represented By: Joseph L. Luvara
Represented By: Amy J. Brinkos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KORIE MORTON-ROZIER
Represented By: Todd J. Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?