HAYNES v. DECANINI et al
Plaintiff: PATRICK HAYNES
Defendant: DPTY. WARDEN WHITE, LT. CIPOLLA, C/O HERMAN, C/O ELLIOT, WARDEN SCHOUPPE, NURSE BETTY, C/O MORELAND, C/O PERKINS, C/O KREPPS, C/O MINE, C/O SUMAN, CPT. TRK, LT. DELANEY, SGT. DECANINI, C/O PEARSALL, LT. BERTICHINNI, C/O CALHOUN, NURSE BONNIE, SGT. HARRIS, C/O COLLELLA, C/O HAUS, SGT. WASHINGTON, C/O INMAN, C/O PETERSON, SGT. FIGUREL and C/O WASHINGTON
Case Number: 2:2021cv00079
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 Correspondence from Plaintiff. If Plaintiff desires to voluntarily dismiss the case, he may file a Notification of Withdrawal of Action and the Court will dismiss the case and not assess the $350.00 filing fee. The Notice of Withdrawal should be filed by 4/9/2021. A copy of the Notice shall be mailed to Plaintiff along with this Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/10/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 Remark: Correspondence received from Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sms)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 Remark: Letter requesting status of case (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER : The Court is in receipt of service forms for each of the named defendants in Plaintiff's Complaint. However, Plaintiff only provided one copy of the Complaint along with the service forms. Plaintiff was instructed in the Order at ECF 7 that a complete copy of his 12-page Complaint must be provided for each of the 25 named Defendants. In the alternative, Plaintiff was given the option to submit payment to the Clerk of Court for copies to be made on his behalf. On or before 3/26/2021, Plaintiff shall submit to the Court 24 complete copies of his 12-page Complaint, or the copy fee of $28.80 ($1.20 per Complaint, for the 24 remaining copies), payable to the Clerk of Court. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action. No extensions will be granted without good cause. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/2/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 MOTION TO EDIT NAME OF ONE DEFENDANT by PATRICK HAYNES. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the name of Defendant WASHINGTON will be amended on the docket to reflect C/O Washington, instead of Sgt. Washington. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/5/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER denying #8 MOTION TO BE TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER FACILITY by PATRICK HAYNES. The federal courts are not overseers of the day-to-day management of prisons. It is well settled that a prisoner has no federal liberty interest guaranteeing that he remain in a particular prison, be transferred to another correctional facility, or be prevented from transferring to another correctional facility. If Plaintiff believes he is being retaliated against, he should file an appropriate administrative grievance. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/5/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bsc)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO EDIT NAME OF ONE DEFENDANT by PATRICK HAYNES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO BE TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER FACILITY by PATRICK HAYNES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR SERVICE DOCUMENTS. Plaintiff shall provide the Court with proper instructions for service upon each of the 25 named defendants, including service forms and copies of the Complaint, on or before 2/24/2021, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/1/2021. (cmc)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against BERTICHINNI, CALHOUN, CIPOLLA, COLLELLA, DECANINI, DELANEY, ELLIOT, FIGUREL, HARRIS, HAUS, HERMAN, INMAN, KREPPS, MINE, MORELAND, NURSE BETTY, NURSE BONNIE, PEARSALL, PERKINS, PETERSON, SCHOUPPE, SUMAN, TRK, WASHINGTON, WHITE ), filed by PATRICK HAYNES. (jd)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/28/2021. (cmc)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by PATRICK HAYNES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR AUTHORIZATION FORM. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis will not be reviewed until an Authorization Form is filed with the Court, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/21/2021. (cmc)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/20/2021. (cmc)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PATRICK HAYNES. (Attachments: #1 Records Officer Authorization, #2 Account Statement, #3 Complaint/Habeas Petition lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #4 Letter Request for Copies, #5 Envelope) (jd) Modified on 1/20/2021 (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAYNES v. DECANINI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPTY. WARDEN WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. CIPOLLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O HERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O ELLIOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN SCHOUPPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE BETTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O MORELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O PERKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O KREPPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O MINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O SUMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPT. TRK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. DELANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. DECANINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O PEARSALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. BERTICHINNI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O CALHOUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE BONNIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O COLLELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O HAUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. WASHINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O INMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O PETERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. FIGUREL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O WASHINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK HAYNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?