ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY v. LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00187
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-06186. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT TRANSFER FORTHWITH THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSLVANIA.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/5/21.2/5/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service.(VOTER, WARREN)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE Pretrial Conference held on 1/28/21 (mbh, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 2, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M. BEFORE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE IS CANCELLED.(dc)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (afm, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC with Certificate of Service by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCGLYNN, JOSEPH)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR FEBRUARY 2, 2021 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE VIA TELECONFEREENCE.(dc)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: A TRIAL SHALL BE HELD ON 5/25/21. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 5/19/21 AT 10:00 AM. ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 2/17/21. THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ANY SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OR OTHER DISPOSITIVE MOTION SHALL BE FILED BY 3/10/21. ALL PARTIES SHALL PREPARE AND FILE WITH THE CLERK OF COURT THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA BY 5/7/21. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 5/7/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 12/17/20. 12/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 12/14/2020. 12/14/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(VOTER, WARREN)
December 8, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.. (fb)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC..(VOTER, WARREN)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14766180), filed by LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Proof of Filing, #5 Exhibit)(VOTER, WARREN) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/8/2020) (fb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY v. LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.
Represented By: Warren E. Voter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Joseph L. McGlynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?