KUTSENKOW v. FUSCARDO et al
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN M. KUTSENKOW
Defendant: GREENBRIER EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, INC., WEIRTON MEDICAL CENTER, BRITTANY HOARD and JESAMYN L. FUSCARDO
Case Number: 2:2021cv00391
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christy Criswell Wiegand
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Tamela J. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 5/11/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Austin T. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 5/11/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
May 11, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Tamela J. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6506662) by JESAMYN L. FUSCARDO, GREENBRIER EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, INC., BRITTANY HOARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (White, Tammy)
May 11, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Austin T. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6506511) by JESAMYN L. FUSCARDO, GREENBRIER EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, INC., BRITTANY HOARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Austin)
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN M. KUTSENKOW. GREENBRIER EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, INC. waiver sent on 3/26/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Luckasevic, Jason)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN M. KUTSENKOW. JESAMYN L. FUSCARDO waiver sent on 3/26/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Luckasevic, Jason)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN M. KUTSENKOW. BRITTANY HOARD waiver sent on 3/26/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Luckasevic, Jason)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Williott on behalf of JESAMYN L. FUSCARDO, GREENBRIER EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, INC., BRITTANY HOARD. (Williott, Anthony)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Voll Poliziani on behalf of WEIRTON MEDICAL CENTER. (Poliziani, Shannon)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN M. KUTSENKOW. WEIRTON MEDICAL CENTER waiver sent on 3/26/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Luckasevic, Jason)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Katlin Connelly Zarisky on behalf of WEIRTON MEDICAL CENTER. (Connelly Zarisky, Katlin)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 3/25/2021. (drc)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 03/25/2021. (drc)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (drc)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JESAMYN L. FUSCARDO, GREENBRIER EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, INC., BRITTANY HOARD, WEIRTON MEDICAL CENTER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6425932), filed by KATHLEEN M. KUTSENKOW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KUTSENKOW v. FUSCARDO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN M. KUTSENKOW
Represented By: Jason E. Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENBRIER EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, INC.
Represented By: Tammy White
Represented By: Anthony J. Williott
Represented By: Austin Tyler Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIRTON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Shannon Voll Poliziani
Represented By: Katlin Connelly Zarisky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITTANY HOARD
Represented By: Tammy White
Represented By: Anthony J. Williott
Represented By: Austin Tyler Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESAMYN L. FUSCARDO
Represented By: Austin Tyler Lewis
Represented By: Tammy White
Represented By: Anthony J. Williott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?