STIFFLER v. APPLE INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT STIFFLER
Defendant: VERIZON, INCORPORATED and APPLE INCORPORATED
Case Number: 2:2021cv00523
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 6/28/2021; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/12/2021; Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 2:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 6/7/2021. (map)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 6/7/2021. (map)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (map)
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Stuart H. Sostmann on behalf of APPLE INCORPORATED. Attorney Brian L. Calistri terminated. (Sostmann, Stuart)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by VERIZON, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Calistri, Brian)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by VERIZON, INCORPORATED Answer due from VERIZON, INCORPORATED on 5/19/2021. (Calistri, Brian)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by APPLE INCORPORATED. (Sostmann, Stuart)
April 27, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 5/4/2021. (jv)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses by APPLE INCORPORATED. (Sostmann, Stuart)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying Verizon Communications Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by VERIZON, INCORPORATED. (Calistri, Brian)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Calistri on behalf of VERIZON, INCORPORATED. (Calistri, Brian)
April 20, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Neither Party filed a disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorneys advised to file statements within 7 days for respective party. Disclosure Statement due by 4/27/2021. (jv)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alleghenty County, case number GD-20-007613 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6467934), filed by APPLE INCORPORATED, VERIZON, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Including Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STIFFLER v. APPLE INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Brian L. Calistri
Represented By: Charlene McLaughlin
Represented By: Stuart H. Sostmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE INCORPORATED
Represented By: Stuart H. Sostmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT STIFFLER
Represented By: Michael F. Santicola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?