MCWILLIAMS v. PLATINUM ADVERTISING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JEREMY MCWILLIAMS
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION, WILLIAM SIVETER, JOHN NELSON, PLATINUM ADVERTISING, LLC, VEXSO BLACK ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC. and PLATINUM ADVERTISING II, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00607
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 joint Motion to stay, as follows. This case is STAYED, and for the duration of the stay, it shall remain ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Administrative closings are a familiar way in which courts remove cases from their active files without final adjudication. Administrative closure is a docket control device used by the Court for statistical purposes, and it does not prejudice the rights of the parties in any manner. Notwithstanding the stay and closure, the parties shall file status reports, as proposed in their Motion, and the Court will lift the stay and reopen the case, as and when appropriate, based on the parties' (final) status report. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 10/22/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
October 22, 2021 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Mediation by JEREMY MCWILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bendau, Clifford) Modified text to remove duplicate language on 10/22/2021. (keh)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #19 Amended Complaint, by the Platinum Defendants and Plaintiff. The Platinum Defendants' answers now are due by 9/30/21. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/3/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
September 3, 2021 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #19 Amended Complaint, filed by JEREMY MCWILLIAMS on Behalf of All Parties by PLATINUM ADVERTISING II, LLC, WILLIAM SIVETER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Armstrong, Joseph)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 the Platinum Defendants' unopposed Motion to extend answer deadline. These Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond now is 9/3/21. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/23/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
August 23, 2021 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #19 Amended Complaint, filed by JEREMY MCWILLIAMS by PLATINUM ADVERTISING II, LLC, WILLIAM SIVETER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Armstrong, Joseph)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER vacating Orders filed at Docs. #16 & #17 . Not all Defendants had answered; and, Plaintiff since has filed an Amended Complaint (Doc. #19 ). The Initial Scheduling Videoconference set for 9/20/21 at 11:00 a.m. is CANCELLED, and will be rescheduled by future order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/11/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
August 10, 2021 Filing 19 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN NELSON, WILLIAM SIVETER, Vexso Black Asset Management, Inc., Platinum Advertising II, LLC JOHN NELSON answer due 8/24/2021; WILLIAM SIVETER answer due 8/24/2021; Vexso Black Asset Management, Inc. answer due 8/24/2021; Platinum Advertising II, LLC answer due 8/24/2021, filed by JEREMY MCWILLIAMS. (Bendau, Clifford)
August 10, 2021 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JOHN DOE CORPORATION. (Hudock, Joseph)
August 10, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/17/2021. (ijh)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/6/21. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Video Initial Case Management Conference set before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/6/21. (jhi)
August 6, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JOHN NELSON. (Hudock, Joseph)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The moving Defendants' deadline for answering or otherwise responding to the Complaint now is 8/16/21. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/1/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JEREMY MCWILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bendau, Clifford)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JEREMY MCWILLIAMS. JOHN DOE CORPORATION waiver sent on 6/15/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Bendau, Clifford)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JEREMY MCWILLIAMS. JOHN NELSON waiver sent on 6/15/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Bendau, Clifford)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Clifford P. Bendau, II, Esq., to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/29/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Clifford P. Bendau, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6586590) by JEREMY MCWILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing) (Bendau, Clifford)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Joseph M. Armstrong, Esq., to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/17/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Joseph M. Armstrong to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6569648) by PLATINUM ADVERTISING, LLC, WILLIAM SIVETER. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph M. Armstrong in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Armstrong, Joseph)
June 8, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. as to JOHN DOE CORPORATION. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 6/15/2021. (jv)
June 8, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer, #5 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 6/15/2021. (jv)
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by PLATINUM ADVERTISING, LLC, WILLIAM SIVETER Answer due from PLATINUM ADVERTISING, LLC on 7/7/2021; WILLIAM SIVETER on 7/7/2021. (Foster, Don)
June 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Don P. Foster on behalf of PLATINUM ADVERTISING, LLC, WILLIAM SIVETER. (Foster, Don)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Hudock, Jr on behalf of JOHN DOE CORPORATION and JOHN NELSON. (Hudock, Joseph) Modified on 5/18/2021 (ma).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/7/21. (jhi)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JOHN NELSON, PLATINUM ADVERTISING, LLC, WILLIAM SIVETER (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (ma)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JOHN NELSON, PLATINUM ADVERTISING, LLC, WILLIAM SIVETER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6502015), filed by JEREMY MCWILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCWILLIAMS v. PLATINUM ADVERTISING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph A. Hudock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM SIVETER
Represented By: Joseph Michael Armstrong
Represented By: Don P. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN NELSON
Represented By: Joseph A. Hudock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLATINUM ADVERTISING, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Michael Armstrong
Represented By: Don P. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VEXSO BLACK ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLATINUM ADVERTISING II, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Michael Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY MCWILLIAMS
Represented By: James L. Simon
Represented By: Clifford P Bendau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?