WILLLIAMS v. COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE SERVICES MANAGER LLC et al
Plaintiff: GERMAINE WILLLIAMS
Defendant: COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE SERVICES MANAGER LLC doing business as BRIGHTON REHABILITATION & WELLNESS CENTER, DAVID G. THIMONS, D.O. and PERSONAL CARE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00635
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 247
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The Court notes that there is a pending Motion to Remand (Doc. #6 ) that is currently in process of briefing. Defendants' due date to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is STAYED pending resolution of the Motion to Remand. If Plaintiff's Motion for Remand is granted, no response shall be required; otherwise, Defendants' response will be due within 21 days of the Court's Order and any further motions regarding briefing may be re-filed at that time. As such, Defendants' Motion to Exceed Page Limit (Doc. #12 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/1/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (scl)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Party. PERSONAL CARE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLC added. DAVID G. THIMONS, DO terminated. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/1/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (scl)
June 29, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE SERVICES MANAGER LLC, DAVID G. THIMONS, DO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Curren, Erica)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Party by GERMAINE WILLLIAMS. (Daley, Robert)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER amending 9 Order Approving Stipulation. Defendants' Response is due on or before July 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/15/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (scl)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Defendants' Response is due on or before July 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/14/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (scl)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE SERVICES MANAGER LLC, DAVID G. THIMONS, DO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Curren, Erica)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support re #6 Motion to Remand filed by GERMAINE WILLLIAMS. (Chiappetta, Elizabeth)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by GERMAINE WILLLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chiappetta, Elizabeth)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE SERVICES MANAGER LLC, DAVID G. THIMONS, DO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Curren, Erica)
May 17, 2021 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from All Defendants by 7/5/21. The parties have filed a Stipulation (Doc. #5 ), consistent with Local Rule 7.E. (dcd)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE SERVICES MANAGER LLC. (Kimball, Andrew)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Kelly Curren on behalf of COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE SERVICES MANAGER LLC, DAVID G. THIMONS, DO. (Curren, Erica)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/14/21. (jhi)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaver County, case number 11117-2 - 2020 Copies attached: State Court Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6511059), filed by COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE SERVICES MANAGER LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M) (elt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLLIAMS v. COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE SERVICES MANAGER LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE SERVICES MANAGER LLC doing business as BRIGHTON REHABILITATION & WELLNESS CENTER
Represented By: Andrew G. Kimball
Represented By: Erica Kelly Curren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID G. THIMONS, D.O.
Represented By: Andrew G. Kimball
Represented By: Erica Kelly Curren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERSONAL CARE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERMAINE WILLLIAMS
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Chiappetta
Represented By: Robert F. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?