ALCARAZ et al v. SCHMIDT LANDSCAPING, INC. et al
Plaintiff: LUIS HERNANDEZ SILVA, JOSE SANTANA ALCARAZ and JOSE AREVALO MENDOZA
Defendant: GARY E. SCHMIDT, PAUL HAUBER, EVERGREEN NURSERY, LLC, LANDSCAPING FOR LE$$, LLC, THERESE SCHMIDT, MICHAEL PANTELY, SCHMIDT LANDSCAPING, INC., ALEJANDRO BRAVO CORIA, SR. and ADAM BEAM
Case Number: 2:2021cv00691
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOSE AREVALO MENDOZA, LUIS HERNANDEZ SILVA, JOSE SANTANA ALCARAZ. PAUL HAUBER served on 7/20/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Kroon, Lerae)
July 22, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOSE AREVALO MENDOZA, LUIS HERNANDEZ SILVA, JOSE SANTANA ALCARAZ. EVERGREEN NURSERY, LLC served on 7/20/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Kroon, Lerae)
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSE AREVALO MENDOZA, LUIS HERNANDEZ SILVA, JOSE SANTANA ALCARAZ. THERESE SCHMIDT waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Kroon, Lerae)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSE AREVALO MENDOZA, LUIS HERNANDEZ SILVA, JOSE SANTANA ALCARAZ. GARY E. SCHMIDT waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Kroon, Lerae)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSE AREVALO MENDOZA, LUIS HERNANDEZ SILVA, JOSE SANTANA ALCARAZ. SCHMIDT LANDSCAPING, INC. waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Kroon, Lerae)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariel Emilia Mussack on behalf of JOSE SANTANA ALCARAZ, JOSE AREVALO MENDOZA, LUIS HERNANDEZ SILVA. (Mussack, Mariel)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nina A Menniti on behalf of JOSE SANTANA ALCARAZ, JOSE AREVALO MENDOZA, LUIS HERNANDEZ SILVA. (Menniti, Nina)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ADAM BEAM, ALEJANDRO BRAVO CORIA, SR, EVERGREEN NURSERY, LLC, PAUL HAUBER, LANDSCAPING FOR LE$$, LLC, MICHAEL PANTELY, GARY E. SCHMIDT, THERESE SCHMIDT, SCHMIDT LANDSCAPING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons) (jjg)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JOSE SANTANA ALCARAZ, JOSE AREVALO MENDOZA, LUIS HERNANDEZ SILVA (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Schmidt Landscaping, #2 Summons Summons G Schmidt, #3 Summons Summons T Schmidt, #4 Summons Summons Bravo, #5 Summons Summons Evergreen Nursery, #6 Summons Summons Hauber, #7 Summons Summons Landscaping for Less, #8 Summons Summons Beam, #9 Summons Summons Pantely) (Kroon, Lerae)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/25/21. (jg)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADAM BEAM, ALEJANDRO BRAVO CORIA, SR, EVERGREEN NURSERY, LLC, PAUL HAUBER, LANDSCAPING FOR LE$$, LLC, MICHAEL PANTELY, GARY E. SCHMIDT, THERESE SCHMIDT, SCHMIDT LANDSCAPING, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6528324), filed by JOSE AREVALO MENDOZA, LUIS HERNANDEZ SILVA, JOSE SANTANA ALCARAZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALCARAZ et al v. SCHMIDT LANDSCAPING, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY E. SCHMIDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL HAUBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERGREEN NURSERY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANDSCAPING FOR LE$$, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESE SCHMIDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL PANTELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHMIDT LANDSCAPING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO BRAVO CORIA, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM BEAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS HERNANDEZ SILVA
Represented By: Lerae Kroon
Represented By: Mariel Emilia Mussack
Represented By: Nina A Menniti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE SANTANA ALCARAZ
Represented By: Lerae Kroon
Represented By: Mariel Emilia Mussack
Represented By: Nina A Menniti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE AREVALO MENDOZA
Represented By: Lerae Kroon
Represented By: Mariel Emilia Mussack
Represented By: Nina A Menniti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?