EASTERN AREA SPECIAL SCHOOLS v. BASF CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: EASTERN AREA SPECIAL SCHOOLS
Defendant: SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. and BASF CORPORATION
3Rd Party Defendant: Cardinal Group Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00692
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy R Schrempf on behalf of EASTERN AREA SPECIAL SCHOOLS. (Schrempf, Amy)
July 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Arthur J. Schwab: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/27/2021; The Court schedules a Status Conference for 8/11/2021 at 09:00 AM via Video Conference before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. (Court Reporter: Marsia Balobeck) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
July 22, 2021 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Cardinal Group Services, Inc. (sdp)
July 21, 2021 Filing 23 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. (Lankford, Ambria )
July 21, 2021 Filing 22 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Amended Answer, Crossclaim, and Third-Party Complaint against Cardinal Group Services, Inc., filed by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract Agreement) (Lankford, Ambria )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File for Leave to File Amended Answer with Third-Party Claim by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/21/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
July 20, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer with Third-Party Claim by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Pleading) (Lankford, Ambria )
July 20, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION Selecting ADR Process by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Lankford, Ambria )
July 19, 2021 Filing 18 Proposed Case Management Order (Joint Proposed Order) by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Lankford, Ambria )
July 19, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lankford, Ambria )
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #14 Amended Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Lankford, Ambria )
June 17, 2021 Filing 15 Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant BASF Corporation to Defendant Siemens Crossclaim ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. by BASF CORPORATION. (Schrock, Terry)
June 17, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM for Indemnification, Contribution and or Set-Off against SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. by BASF CORPORATION. (Schrock, Terry)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 7/27/2021 at 09:00 AM in Video Conference before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due on 7/19/21. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 6/2/21. (lck)
May 28, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint of BASF Corporation (doc.1-1 at p.69) by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Lankford, Ambria )
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 Defendant Siemens Industry, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against BASF CORPORATION by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Kiefer, Stephen)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/26/21. (ms)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Kenneth Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/25/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Kenneth Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6531073) by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Perry, Kenneth)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Ambria L. Lankford to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/25/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Ambria L. Lankford to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6530979) by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Lankford, Ambria )
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying BASF USA Holding LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BASF CORPORATION. (Schrock, Terry)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Kiefer, Stephen)
May 25, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY re Terminated Case. Closed in error. Case reopened. (sdp)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Joinder and Consent to Notice of Removal by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. (sdp)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny county, case number 21-001682 with jury demand Copies attached: state court record (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6528449), filed by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EASTERN AREA SPECIAL SCHOOLS v. BASF CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.
Represented By: Jane Fox Lehman
Represented By: Kenneth Perry
Represented By: Stephen W. Kiefer
Represented By: Ambria Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF CORPORATION
Represented By: Terry A. Schrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EASTERN AREA SPECIAL SCHOOLS
Represented By: William Andrews
Represented By: Amy R Schrempf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Cardinal Group Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?