SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. CARNEY et al
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: KEVIN T. CARNEY, ROBERT J. IREY and JONATHAN D. FREEZE
Case Number: 2:2021cv00720
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Referring Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 20 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ROBERT J. IREY (cel)
July 15, 2021 Filing 19 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JONATHAN D. FREEZE (cel)
July 15, 2021 Filing 18 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to KEVIN T. CARNEY (cel)
July 15, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #12 Affidavit of Service, #14 Affidavit of Service, #13 Affidavit of Service. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Summons / Return of Service Returned Executed. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
July 12, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION for entry of DEFAULT against ROBERT J. IREY . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen M. Klotz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Klotz, Karen)
July 12, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION for entry of DEFAULT against JONATHAN D. FREEZE . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen M. Klotz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Klotz, Karen)
July 12, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION for entry of DEFAULT against KEVIN T. CARNEY . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen M. Klotz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Klotz, Karen)
June 16, 2021 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. KEVIN T. CARNEY served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021; JONATHAN D. FREEZE served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021; ROBERT J. IREY served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. See the documents filed at #12 , #13 and #14 (cel)
June 16, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Robert J. Irey on 6/9/2021, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Klotz, Karen)
June 16, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Jonathan D. Freeze on 6/9/2021, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Klotz, Karen)
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Kevin T. Carney on 6/9/2021, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Klotz, Karen)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Jennifer Chun Barry, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (on behalf of Plaintiff). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 6/16/21. (jg)
June 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Jennifer Chun Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70 by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Jennifer Chun Barry, #2 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Good Standing for Jennifer Chun Barry, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Barry, Jennifer)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Karen M. Klotz, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (on behalf of Plaintiff). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 6/16/21. (jg)
June 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Karen M. Klotz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70 by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Karen M. Klotz, #2 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Good Standing of Karen M. Klotz, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Klotz, Karen)
June 16, 2021 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from KEVIN T. CARNEY on 6/30/2021; JONATHAN D. FREEZE on 6/30/2021; ROBERT J. IREY on 6/30/2021 (jd)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 6/3/21. (jg)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Judge Colville's brother's employment with the United States Attorney's Office. (jg)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Colville for all further proceedings. Judge William S. Stickman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/03/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to KEVIN T. CARNEY, JONATHAN D. FREEZE, ROBERT J. IREY (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (cel)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEVIN T. CARNEY, JONATHAN D. FREEZE, ROBERT J. IREY filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. CARNEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN T. CARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT J. IREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN D. FREEZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Karen M. Klotz
Represented By: Jennifer Chun Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?