PASPARAGE v. THE PROGRESSIVE GROUP OF COMPANIES et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS PASPARAGE
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and THE PROGRESSIVE GROUP OF COMPANIES
Case Number: 2:2021cv00729
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Referring Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss; in light of the filing of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, ECF No. 7, and the Answer filed by Defendants in response thereto, ECF No. 8, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss at ECF No. 4 is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 7/26/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ndf)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Full Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, see #11 . Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/23/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi)
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by DENNIS PASPARAGE. (Walter, Robert)
July 23, 2021 Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly presiding. (cww)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/7/21. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/7/21. (jhi)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE PROGRESSIVE GROUP OF COMPANIES. (Ramaley, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2021 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY on 7/9/2021; PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY on 7/9/2021; THE PROGRESSIVE GROUP OF COMPANIES on 7/9/2021 (jd)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE PROGRESSIVE GROUP OF COMPANIES PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 7/26/2021; PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 7/26/2021; THE PROGRESSIVE GROUP OF COMPANIES answer due 7/26/2021, filed by DENNIS PASPARAGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Walter, Robert)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Response re #4 Motion to Dismiss. Consistent with the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-bissoon-district-judge), Plaintiff's response is due by 6/28/21. All future motions in this case will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures, and no briefing schedule will issue. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in this case, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before 6/18/21. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/8/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cyk)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Dismiss, filed by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE PROGRESSIVE GROUP OF COMPANIES. (Ramaley, Jeffrey)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE PROGRESSIVE GROUP OF COMPANIES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions) (Ramaley, Jeffrey)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/8/21. (jhi)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., The Progressive Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE PROGRESSIVE GROUP OF COMPANIES. (jd)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from ALLEGHENY COUNTY, case number GD 21-004650 with both Copies attached: Lower Court Complaint, Exhibits, Notice of Filing (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-654489), filed by THE PROGRESSIVE GROUP OF COMPANIES, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Lower Court Documents including Complaint, Exhibits, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PASPARAGE v. THE PROGRESSIVE GROUP OF COMPANIES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS PASPARAGE
Represented By: Robert P. Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROGRESSIVE GROUP OF COMPANIES
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?