HIGH TECH HAIR LLC et al v. ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Plaintiff: CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE, HIGH TECH HAIR LLC and ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Case Number: 2:2021cv00731
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 45 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-02895. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 30, 2020 Filing 44 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order, ORDERD THAT THE ACTIONS LISTED ON SCHEDULE A AND PENDING OUTSIDE THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND, WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE MARK R. HORNAK FOR COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS. (sg, ) Modified on 12/31/2020 (sg, ).
December 21, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Joint) Regarding JPML Transfer Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Transfer Order on MDL No. 2969)(HORST, ROBERT)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DUE 12/21/20. PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ANY RULE 12 MOTION IS DUE BY 1/4/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/7/20. 12/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 7, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR 12/22/20 AT 10:30AM IS CANCELLED
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT REGARDING DEFT'S SECOND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/22/2020 AT 10:30 A.M. BY VIDEO CONFERENCE BEFORE THE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY, IN COURTROOM 6A, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILA., PA 19106, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/4/20. 12/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 39 STIPULATION To Extend Deadlines by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (HORST, ROBERT)
December 3, 2020 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS against ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, filed by HIGH TECH HAIR LLC, ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC, CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C (part 1), #4 Exhibit Exhibit C (part 2), #5 Exhibit Exhibit C (part 3), #6 Exhibit Exhibit C (part 4), #7 Exhibit Exhibit C (part 5))(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (ECF NO. 34) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/3/20.12/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION (ECF NO 33) IS GRANTED. PLFFS' FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 33-3 EX. 1) IS HEREBY CONSIDERED FILED AS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER & PLFFS SHALL FILE A CLEAN COPY OF EXHIBIT 1 EXACTLY AS WORDED IN EXHIBIT 1 ON OR BY 12/4/2020. DEFT SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO PLFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BY 12/9/2020 AND ITS SECOND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ON OR BY 12/10/2020, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/3/20. 12/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER THAT MOTIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE (DKT. NOS. 31 & 32) OF ADAM J. LEVITT, ESQ. AND KENNETH P. ABBARNO, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) ARE GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/3/20.12/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
December 3, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE, HIGH TECH HAIR LLC, ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC.Certificate of Service.(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT)
December 3, 2020 Filing 33 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint filed by CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE, HIGH TECH HAIR LLC, ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit)(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT)
December 2, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice KENNETH P. ABBARNO ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14751212.) filed by CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE, HIGH TECH HAIR LLC, ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BERGER, MARNI)
December 2, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ADAM J. LEVITT ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14750730.) filed by CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE, HIGH TECH HAIR LLC, ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BERGER, MARNI)
November 18, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Brief. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A (Part 1), #3 Exhibit A (Part 2), #4 Exhibit A (Part 3), #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Proposed Order, #12 Certificate of Service)(HORST, ROBERT) Modified on 11/20/2020 (tjd).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF KRISTIN SHEPARD TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/16/20. 11/16/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED. (JL )
November 13, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Kristin A. Shepard ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14709927.) filed by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE.Certificate of Service.(POWERS, TIFFANY)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER THAT IF DEFT DECIDES TO FILE A MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(c), IT IS ORDERED THAT DEFT MUST DO SO ON OR BEFORE 11/18/2020. PLFF MUST FILE A RESPONSE ON OR BEFORE 12/7/2020, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/22/20. 10/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT (Joint) Regarding Scheduling Order by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(MALAMUD, MATTHEW)
October 14, 2020 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC.(GOODMAN, JEFFREY)
October 14, 2020 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HIGH TECH HAIR LLC.(GOODMAN, JEFFREY)
October 14, 2020 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE.(GOODMAN, JEFFREY)
October 13, 2020 DOC 21-22 MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 10/13/2020. (kp, )
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES MUST MEET AND CONFER REGARDING THE TIME AND STEPS THEY NEED TO COMPLETE A RECORD FOR THE CROSS MOTIONS ON THE SOLE ISSUE OF COVERAGE, RESPONSES, REPLIES AND DATE FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. THE COURT WILL NOT PROCEED ON CLASS CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY AND ISSUES UNTIL IT HAS RULED ON ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/9/20. 10/9/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL )
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON TO HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/6/20. 10/6/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL ) .
October 1, 2020 Filing 20 Statement Concerning Related Case Treatment by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HORST, ROBERT)
September 30, 2020 Filing 19 Report of Telephone Conference for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON on 9/30/20. (kw, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE re: Cancellation of HearingPRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/7/20 AT 11:30 A.M. IS CANCELED.(lds, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing:*RESCHEDULED* PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/7/2020 11:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520.(lds, )
September 23, 2020 COPY OF ORDER #16 AND ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO ATTORNEY KAISER. (jpd, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ADAM J. KAISER, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/22/20.9/22/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO KAISER. (fdc)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Adam J. Kaiser ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14583150.) filed by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE.Certificate of Service.(POWERS, TIFFANY)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing:PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/30/2020 11:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(lds, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by MARNI BERGER on behalf of CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE, HIGH TECH HAIR LLC, ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC (BERGER, MARNI)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY L. POWERS on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (POWERS, TIFFANY)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE.(MALAMUD, MATTHEW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(HORST, ROBERT)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT HIGH TECH HAIR LLC ANSWER BY 8/21/2020.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/27/20. 7/27/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW MALAMUD on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (MALAMUD, MATTHEW)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT M. RUNYON, III on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (RUNYON, ROBERT)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT T. HORST on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (HORST, ROBERT)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY P. GOODMAN on behalf of CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE T/A LAVILLA, HIGH TECH HAIR LLC, ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC (GOODMAN, JEFFREY)
June 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Forwarded To: Robert J. Mongeluzzi on 6/18/20 (fdc, )
June 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE, HIGH TECH HAIR LLC, ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC. (tjd)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK HOWARD on behalf of CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE T/A LAVILLA, HIGH TECH HAIR LLC, ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC (HOWARD, PATRICK)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI on behalf of CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE T/A LAVILLA, HIGH TECH HAIR LLC, ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC (MONGELUZZI, ROBERT)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL B. DORDICK on behalf of CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE T/A LAVILLA, HIGH TECH HAIR LLC, ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC (DORDICK, SAMUEL)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14359704.), filed by CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE T/A LAVILLA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(MONGELUZZI, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIGH TECH HAIR LLC et al v. ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPUCINNO PIZZERIA RISTORANTE
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Goodman
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: MARNI BERGER
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Samuel B. Dordick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIGH TECH HAIR LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Goodman
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: MARNI BERGER
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Samuel B. Dordick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE GLAM HAIR STUDIO, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Goodman
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Kenneth P. Abbarno
Represented By: MARNI BERGER
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Samuel B. Dordick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Represented By: Tiffany L Powers
Represented By: Adam J. Kaiser
Represented By: ROBERT M. RUNYON, III
Represented By: KRISTIN A. SHEPARD
Represented By: MATTHEW MALAMUD
Represented By: Robert T. Horst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?