ELLENBERGER et al v. JUSTICEWORKS YOUTHCARE, INC.
Plaintiff: LEAH ELLENBERGER and CAITLAN SHOOP
Defendant: JUSTICEWORKS YOUTHCARE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00732
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. The Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference originally set for 8/18/2021 is canceled and rescheduled for 8/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Telephone Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/29/2021. (dmm)
July 27, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by JUSTICEWORKS YOUTHCARE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DeWalt, Suzanne)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Stacey Thomsen, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/27/2021. (dmm)
July 26, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Stacy W. Thomsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6626692) by LEAH ELLENBERGER, CAITLAN SHOOP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Thomsen, Stacy)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report and ADR Stipulation. The Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference initially set for 7/26/2021 is canceled and rescheduled for 8/18/2021 at 10:30 AM in a Telephone Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/21/2021. (dmm)
July 20, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Order re #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File 26(f) Report and ADR Stipulation by LEAH ELLENBERGER, CAITLAN SHOOP. (Hedgpeth, Travis)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Travis Hedgpeth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/20/2021. (dmm)
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report and ADR Stipulation by LEAH ELLENBERGER. (Geist, Joshua)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Travis M. Hedgpeth to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6614281) by LEAH ELLENBERGER, CAITLAN SHOOP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Hedgpeth, Travis)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 EXHIBITS A in Support of #1 Complaint by LEAH ELLENBERGER. (Geist, Joshua)
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT TO OPT IN as a class member by Philicia Nichols. (Geist, Joshua)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER, a Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is set for 7/26/2021 at 10:30 AM in Telephone Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Rule 26(f) Report of Parties, #2 Exhibit B Stipulation Selecting ADR Process) (dmm)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by JUSTICEWORKS YOUTHCARE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Position Summary, #2 Exhibit 2 - CS Offer Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - LE Offer Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Overtime Policy, #5 Exhibit 5 - Timekeeping Rules, #6 Exhibit 6 - LE Paystub, #7 Exhibit 7 - Open Door Policy - LE, #8 Exhibit 8 - Open Door Policy - CS) (DeWalt, Suzanne)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JUSTICEWORKS YOUTHCARE, INC.. (DeWalt, Suzanne)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne L. DeWalt on behalf of JUSTICEWORKS YOUTHCARE, INC.. (DeWalt, Suzanne)
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/7/2021. (dmm)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTIONS PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/7/2021. (dmm)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JUSTICEWORKS YOUTHCARE, INC. (sdp)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JUSTICEWORKS YOUTHCARE, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6545202), filed by LEAH ELLENBERGER, CAITLAN SHOOP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELLENBERGER et al v. JUSTICEWORKS YOUTHCARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAH ELLENBERGER
Represented By: Joshua P. Geist
Represented By: Travis Hedgpeth
Represented By: Stacey Thomsen
Represented By: Stacy Wisner Thomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAITLAN SHOOP
Represented By: Joshua P. Geist
Represented By: Travis Hedgpeth
Represented By: Stacey Thomsen
Represented By: Stacy Wisner Thomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTICEWORKS YOUTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Suzanne L. DeWalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?