PASTORIES v. SMITH et al
Petitioner: ADAM PASTORIES
Respondent: BARRY SMITH and THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY
Case Number: 2:2021cv00737
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 Remark: Service copies were forwarded to the U.S. Marshal. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING that the United States Marshal shall make service of this order, together with a copy of the (ECF. No. #4 ) Petition for Writ of Habeas upon the respondents, Superintendent of S.C.I. Houtzdale, Barry Smith, the Attorney General of the State of Pennsylvania as well as the District Attorney of Allegheny County, with costs to be advanced by the United States. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of service of this order, respondents shall respond to the allegations of the petition for writ of habeas corpus. The District Attorney shall address both the merits of the petition and exhaustion of state court remedies. The answer shall comply with the requirements of Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. The District Attorney shall furnish this court with the state court records, including all relevant transcripts, all briefs filed by petitioner, and all written opinions of the courts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from this date to appeal this order to a district judge pursuant to Rule 72.C.2 of the Local Rules. Failure to appeal within fourteen (14) days will constitute waiver of the right to appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 06/11/2021. (jmb)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate and mark CLOSED Civil Action No. 21-708, as it is duplicative to Civil Action No. 21-737. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any and all further filings that relate to Petitioner's habeas proceedings challenging his judgment of sentence at CP-02-CR-0011675-2015 should be clearly marked with Civil Action No. 21-737 and filed in that case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on June 9, 2021. (kcb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 24668069380), filed by ADAM PASTORIES. (ma)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 24668069380 (ma)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by ADAM PASTORIES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ma)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ADAM PASTORIES. (Attachments: #1 Habeas Petition lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Envelope) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PASTORIES v. SMITH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BARRY SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ADAM PASTORIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?