KALLOK et al v. WING ENTERPRISES, INC
Plaintiff: SHANA KALLOK and PAUL KALLOK
Defendant: WING ENTERPRISES, INC trading and doing business as LITTLE GIANT LADDER and WING ENTERPRISES, INC trading and doing business as LITTLE GIANT LADDER SYSTEMS
Case Number: 2:2021cv00805
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by PAUL KALLOK. (Inman, Christopher) Modified text on 8/18/2021. (mqe)
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WING ENTERPRISES, INC. (Johnson, David)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Joseph Margonari on behalf of WING ENTERPRISES, INC. (Margonari, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/5/2021. (jjg)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 8/17/2021; Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 8/18/2021; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/24/2021; Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 8/24/2021; and Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. The parties are directed to AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES 6 , for instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 07/28/21. (nls)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by WING ENTERPRISES, INC. (Johnson, David)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WING ENTERPRISES, INC. WING ENTERPRISES, INC waiver sent on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Johnson, David)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Johnson on behalf of WING ENTERPRISES, INC. (Johnson, David)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to WING ENTERPRISES, INC (elt)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WING ENTERPRISES, INC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6573908), filed by PAUL KALLOK, SHANA KALLOK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KALLOK et al v. WING ENTERPRISES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANA KALLOK
Represented By: Christopher Charles Inman
Represented By: George M. Kontos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL KALLOK
Represented By: Christopher Charles Inman
Represented By: George M. Kontos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WING ENTERPRISES, INC trading and doing business as LITTLE GIANT LADDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WING ENTERPRISES, INC trading and doing business as LITTLE GIANT LADDER SYSTEMS
Represented By: David R. Johnson
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Margonari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?