SHEAFFER v. SAUL
Plaintiff: DEREK JONATHAN SHEAFFER
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 2:2021cv00852
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Alan N Bloch
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney General, #2 U.S. Attorney) (sdp)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL ), filed by DEREK JONATHAN SHEAFFER. (sdp)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file the complaint attached to said motion. Signed by Judge Alan N. Bloch on 7/9/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dpo)
July 2, 2021 Judge Alan N. Bloch presiding. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. (cww)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEREK JONATHAN SHEAFFER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #4 Summons 1, #5 Summons 2, #6 Summons 3) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHEAFFER v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK JONATHAN SHEAFFER
Represented By: Christine M. Nebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?