LEISTEN v. CBS BROADCASTING, INC et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL LEISTEN
Defendant: CBS BROADCASTING, INC, VIACOMCBS, INC, PITTSBURGH TELEVISION STATION WPCW INC, JOHN DOES, CBS BROADCASTING, INC. and VIACOMCBS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00974
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying National Amusments, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CBS BROADCASTING, INC., PITTSBURGH TELEVISION STATION WPCW INC, VIACOMCBS, INC.. (Seidlin-Bernstein, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING the #7 Motion for Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/02/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6688888) by CBS BROADCASTING, INC., PITTSBURGH TELEVISION STATION WPCW INC, VIACOMCBS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Seidlin-Bernstein, Elizabeth)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DANIEL LEISTEN. PITTSBURGH TELEVISION STATION WPCW INC waiver sent on 7/23/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Preiser, Blair)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DANIEL LEISTEN. VIACOMCBS, INC. waiver sent on 7/23/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Preiser, Blair)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DANIEL LEISTEN. CBS BROADCASTING, INC. waiver sent on 7/23/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Preiser, Blair)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DANIEL LEISTEN. (Preiser, Blair)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 07/23/2021. (jmb)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CBS BROADCASTING, INC, JOHN DOES, PITTSBURGH TELEVISION STATION WPCW INC, VIACOMCBS, INC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6621996), filed by DANIEL LEISTEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEISTEN v. CBS BROADCASTING, INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL LEISTEN
Represented By: Blair T. Preiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS BROADCASTING, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOMCBS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITTSBURGH TELEVISION STATION WPCW INC
Represented By: Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS BROADCASTING, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOMCBS, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?