ISENBERG v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Plaintiff: Bobbi-jo Isenberg
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv01147
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/31/21. (ms)
August 31, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
August 31, 2021 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-02694. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED THAT THE UNOPPOSED MOTION OF DEFENDANT STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY FOR A TRANSFER OF VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) IS GRANTED. THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/30/2021.8/30/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit)(DESIPIO, YOLANDA)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ANY MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) ON OR BEFORE WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 11, 2021.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 7/28/2021. 7/28/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III Status Conference held on 7/28/2021. (sg, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, )
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT, STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, TO ANSWER ONLY TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL JUNE 25, 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 6/23/2021. 6/24/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint together with with affirmative defenses by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DESIPIO, YOLANDA)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (DESIPIO, YOLANDA)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/28/2021 09:30 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. ADDITIONAL CONFERENCE INFORMATION CONTAINED HEREIN.(km, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(DESIPIO, YOLANDA)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15192037), filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(DESIPIO, YOLANDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISENBERG v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbi-jo Isenberg
Represented By: VINCENT J. DOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Yolanda Konopacka DeSipio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?