ANDERSON v. COVINE et al
Plaintiff: BRIAN L. ANDERSON
Defendant: GUARD COVINE, GUARD CAMPBELL, SERGEANT COULTER, SERGEANT GANDZARSKI, CAPT. EDWARDS, CAPT. PIENDEL, MR. ORLANDO HARPER and ALLEGHENY COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 2:2021cv01294
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION respectfully recommending that the #9 Complaint be dismissed. As more fully stated in the R&R. Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/10/2021. (dad)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by BRIAN L. ANDERSON. FILER advised that the change of address has been made on above captioned matter only. If you wish to have address changed on other matters before this court, it is your responsibility to file such a notice at each case number. This NEF has been mailed to BRIAN L. ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kss)
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 Remark: Copy of ECF #8 mailed to Plaintiff returned to the court marked "RTS. Temp Release." (sms)
November 10, 2021 Judge David S. Cercone is presiding and Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly is referred. (mao)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT, CAMPBELL, COULTER, COVINE, EDWARDS, GANDZARSKI, ORLANDO HARPER, PIENDEL ), filed by BRIAN L. ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (kss)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to REOPEN this case and file the Complaint and exhibits attached thereto. As more fully stated in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/29/2021. (dad)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BRIAN L. ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kss)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by BRIAN L. ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement, #2 Envelope) (kss)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by BRIAN L. ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kss)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEFICIENCY ORDER: Submission of Required Paperwork due by 11/15/2021. Clerk is to mark this CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. As more fully stated in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix IFP Certification Form) (dad)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by BRIAN L. ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lyk)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by BRIAN L. ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lyk)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BRIAN L. ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Authorization By Prisoner, #5 Envelope) (lyk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDERSON v. COVINE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN L. ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUARD COVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUARD CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT COULTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT GANDZARSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPT. EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPT. PIENDEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. ORLANDO HARPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?