RANKIN v. PTC GROUP HOLDINGS LLC et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS P. RANKIN
Defendant: PTC GROUP HOLDINGS LLC, PTC ALLIANCE LLC, PTC ALLIANCE HOLDINGS CORP., PTC ALLIANCE CORP., BLACK DIAMOND CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC and CARY M. HART
Case Number: 2:2021cv01321
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Hentosz on behalf of CARY M. HART, PTC ALLIANCE LLC. (Hentosz, Brian)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CARY M. HART, PTC ALLIANCE LLC Answer due from CARY M. HART on 12/17/2021; PTC ALLIANCE LLC on 12/17/2021. (Hentosz, Brian)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THOMAS P. RANKIN. CARY M. HART waiver sent on 10/5/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Winslow, Steven)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THOMAS P. RANKIN. PTC ALLIANCE LLC waiver sent on 10/5/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Winslow, Steven)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/5/2021. (et)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BLACK DIAMOND CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, CARY M. HART, PTC ALLIANCE CORP., PTC ALLIANCE HOLDINGS CORP., PTC ALLIANCE LLC, PTC GROUP HOLDINGS LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6738320), filed by THOMAS P. RANKIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (keh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RANKIN v. PTC GROUP HOLDINGS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS P. RANKIN
Represented By: Steven E. Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTC GROUP HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTC ALLIANCE LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Hentosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTC ALLIANCE HOLDINGS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTC ALLIANCE CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACK DIAMOND CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARY M. HART
Represented By: Brian M. Hentosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?