BUCKINGHAM MANUFACTURING CO., INC. v. BASHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Plaintiff: BUCKINGHAM MANUFACTURING CO., INC.
Defendant: BASHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01390
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christy Criswell Wiegand
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 17 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BASHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Friedman, Barry)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Allen Hoppe on behalf of BUCKINGHAM MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Hoppe, Bradley)
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Copeland on behalf of BUCKINGHAM MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Copeland, Jessica)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 10:30 AM in Telephonic Conference before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 11/18/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report and ADR Stipulation due by 11/24/2021. Confidential Position Letters due by 11/29/2021. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 11/4/2021. (jmm)
November 2, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BASHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Friedman, Barry)
October 27, 2021 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BASHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Must, Brian)
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Must on behalf of BASHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Must, Brian)
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry I. Friedman on behalf of BASHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Friedman, Barry)
October 20, 2021 Filing 9 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jmm)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 10/20/2021. (jmm)
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm)
October 20, 2021 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from BASHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC. on 11/8/2021. (jmm)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BUCKINGHAM MANUFACTURING CO., INC. BASHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC. served on 10/18/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Soller, Eric) Modified text to change the year of service as reflected on the document on 10/20/2021. (jmm)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (cel)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BASHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC. (cel)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/18/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mwm)
October 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly no longer assigned to case. (lar)
October 18, 2021 Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand presiding. (lar)
October 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly presiding. (lar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUCKINGHAM MANUFACTURING CO., INC. v. BASHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUCKINGHAM MANUFACTURING CO., INC.
Represented By: Bradley Allen Hoppe
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Represented By: Jessica L. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Brian T. Must
Represented By: Barry I. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?