WALSH v. INTRA-NATIONAL HOME CARE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SECRETARY OF LABOR MARTIN J. WALSH
Defendant: INTRA-NATIONAL HOME CARE, LLC and DILLI ADHIKARI
Case Number: 2:2021cv01391
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Waiver of Service Executed. ERROR: Case number is missing on the second waiver. CORRECTION: Attorney is directed to file an Errata with the case number. (keh)
December 2, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARTIN J. WALSH. DILLI ADHIKARI waiver sent on 11/2/2021, answer due 1/3/2022; INTRA-NATIONAL HOME CARE, LLC waiver sent on 11/2/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Dennis, Ethan)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, the Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to another Judge on this Court. Judge Nora Barry Fischer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/20/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Arthur J. Schwab recused. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/20/21. (lck)
October 20, 2021 Judge David S. Cercone presiding. (lar)
October 20, 2021 Judge Nora Barry Fischer presiding. (lar)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 12/19/21. (ms)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DILLI ADHIKARI, INTRA-NATIONAL HOME CARE, LLC, filed by MARTIN J. WALSH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Schedule A) (lyk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALSH v. INTRA-NATIONAL HOME CARE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECRETARY OF LABOR MARTIN J. WALSH
Represented By: Ethan Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTRA-NATIONAL HOME CARE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DILLI ADHIKARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?