Means v. Koninklijke Philips N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Clarence Dale Means
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V, PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC and PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC. doing business as PHILIPS RESPIRONICS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01437
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL ORDER #4. As more fully set forth in the attached order: the deadline for the parties to file a proposed interim preservation order, originally established in Pretrial Order No. 2, is hereby extended until Thursday, December 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/14/2021. (sms)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/10/2021. (sms)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/10/2021. (sms)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER #3. As more fully set forth in the attached order: the Initial Status Conference will take place on 12/15/2021 at 02:00 PM; the dial-in number for the initial status conference, which shall be used by any individual who wants to listen to the initial status conference, but not participate in the conference, is 888-363-4749, and the access code is 1490596; the court will email the information for participation in the initial status conference via videoconferencing to any attorney of record who files a motion for alternative method to appear and whose motion is granted by the court. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/1/2021. (sms)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL ORDER #2 with Respect to (1) Interim Modifications to the Preservation Requirements and (2) Appointment of Interim Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for the Purpose of Negotiating an Interim Proposed Preservation Order, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/19/2021. (sms)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Initial Status Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Motions to appear by an alternative method and Notices of any plaintiff appearing through a designated attorney instead of the plaintiff's attorney of record are due by 12/8/2021 as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/10/2021. (sms)
October 21, 2021 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-01916. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 20, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Western District of Pennsylvania per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Joy Flowers Conti.(MMP)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/8/2021. (TJB)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT-ONLY ORDER Cancelling Deadline & Hearing. The hearing set before Mag. Judge Schultz on 10/12/21 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/6/2021. (TJB)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing John P. Lavelle, Jr.; Samuel R. Rowley as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (lmb)
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer : (Corrected) Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2021 at 02:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Talarico, Amy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer filed by Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC.(Talarico, Amy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #6 Motion to Stay filed by Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC.(Talarico, Amy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration of Amy J. Talarico, Esquire in Support of #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer filed by Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Talarico, Amy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer filed by Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Talarico, Amy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer : Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Talarico, Amy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer filed by Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (Talarico, Amy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendants Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (Talarico, Amy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico on behalf of Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (Talarico, Amy)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (MTP)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd/4th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-01916 PJS/DTS. (MTP)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8974882) filed by Clarence Dale Means. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shelquist, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Means v. Koninklijke Philips N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Dale Means
Represented By: Rebecca A. Peterson
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC. doing business as PHILIPS RESPIRONICS, INC.
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?