SWANN v. KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. et al
Plaintiff: JEFFREY SWANN
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V, PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC and PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01476
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:21-cv-11142. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 21, 2021 Filing 19 Case Electronically transferred to Western District of Pennyslvania pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 10/20/2021 Original file and certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to the Clerk in that district. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11132-DJC et al.(Currie, Haley)
October 21, 2021 Filing 18 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying as moot #12 Motion to Stay in light of the MDL transfer to the Western District of Pennsylvania (Hourihan, Lisa)
October 20, 2021 Filing 17 Certified copy of MDL Initial Transfer Order in MDL Case 3014 received from Western District of Pennsylvania requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11132-DJC et al.(Currie, Haley)
October 20, 2021 Filing 16 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1 in MDL Case 3014 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11130-DJC et al.(Jones, Sherry)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Philips RS North America, LLC served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Kelley, Walter)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Philips North America LLC served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Kelley, Walter)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer filed by Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Savrin, Daniel)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer by Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America, LLC.(Savrin, Daniel)
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Philips Holding USA Inc, Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips Naamloze Venootschap, Corporate Parent Philips RS North America Holding Corporation for Philips RS North America, LLC ; Corporate Parent Philips Holding USA Inc, Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips Naamloze Venootschap for Philips North America LLC.. (Savrin, Daniel)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma D. Hall on behalf of Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America, LLC (Hall, Emma)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Savrin on behalf of Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America, LLC (Savrin, Daniel)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Jeffrey Swann RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF MANNAS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND APPOINT INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Leviton, Jason)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. With the approval of Judge Casper pursuant to Local Rule 41, this case is transferred to Judge Casper as it is related to a previously filed action pending before her.(McDonagh, Christina)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Jeffrey Swann Notice of Related Case (Kelley, Walter)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint by Jeffrey Swann. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet)(Currie, Haley)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Koninklijke Philips N.V., PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8855496 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jeffrey Swann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Kelley, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SWANN v. KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY SWANN
Represented By: Walter Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: Daniel S. Savrin
Represented By: Emma D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Represented By: Daniel S. Savrin
Represented By: Emma D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?