MATHIS et al v. CARNEY et al
Plaintiff: JANIIS MATHIS and LAWRENCE MICHAELS
Defendant: JOHN CARNEY, CLAIRE DEMATTE, PERRY PHELPS, DAVID PIERCE, JOHN D. WETZEL, JOHN/JANE DOE, MICHEAL ZAKEN, DEPUTY BUZAS, DELASANDROS and COULEHAN
Case Number: 2:2021cv01573
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the United States Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the Complaint, notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons, and waiver, along with this Order, to Defendants as directed by the Plaintiff, costs to be advanced by the United States of America. The Defendants are requested to waive service pursuant to Rule 4(d). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/15/2021. (cmc)
December 7, 2021 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER deferring ruling on MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order #20 by JANIIS MATHIS and LAWRENCE MICHAELS until such time as Defendants have been served and have had an opportunity to respond. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/7/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bsc)
December 7, 2021 Filing 21 DECLARATION re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JANIIS MATHIS, LAWRENCE MICHAELS Affiant: JANIIS MATHIS and LAWRENCE MICHAELS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
December 7, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by JANIIS MATHIS, LAWRENCE MICHAELS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR SERVICE DOCUMENTS. On or before 12/23/2021, Plaintiffs shall provide the Court with one complete copy of their 35-page Complaint for each of the 9 named defendants, for a total of 9 copies, or in the alternative, shall submit a total payment of $31.50 (a single payment of $31.50 or two payments of $15.75) for service copies of the complaint to be made on their behalf, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/23/2021. (cmc)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #17 MOTION (Request) for appointment of Counsel by JANIIS MATHIS, LAWRENCE MICHAELS. From the face of the instant motion, it appears that this motion was prepared by inmate "Rev. Augustus Enoch, on sight legal aid to the plantiffs." As indicated in the Order, an individual proceeding pro se may not be represented by a non-lawyer in federal court and so doing constitutes the unauthorized practice of law. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/22/2021. (bsc)
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION (Request) for appointment of Counsel by JANIIS MATHIS, LAWRENCE MICHAELS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
November 19, 2021 Filing 16 Partial Payment of Filing Fee by JANIIS MATHIS. Fee $120.60, receipt number 24668072206. (jv)
November 19, 2021 Filing 15 Partial Payment of Filing Fee by LAWRENCE MICHAELS. Fee $43.61, receipt number 24668072205. (jv)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JANIIS MATHIS, LAWRENCE MICHAELS. (bsc)
November 10, 2021 Filing 13 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by LAWRENCE MICHAELS. (jv)
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by JANIIS MATHIS. (jv)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 COMPLAINT against BUZAS, JOHN CARNEY, COULEHAN, DELASANDROS, CLAIRE DEMATTE, JOHN/JANE DOE(Maryland State Police), JOHN/JANE DOE(Delaware State Police), JOHN/JANE DOE(Delaware Department of Corrections Officer Cert Team), PERRY PHELPS, DAVID PIERCE, JOHN D. WETZEL, MICHEAL ZAKEN, filed by LAWRENCE MICHAELS, JANIIS MATHIS. (jv)
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LAWRENCE MICHAELS. Plaintiff MICHAELS's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED to the extent that the case may proceed without the prepayment of the entire filing fee, and the Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. Plaintiff MICHAELS is advised that no further action will be taken in this case until the initial partial filing fee of $43.61 is paid in full, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/10/2021. (cmc)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JANIIS MATHIS. Plaintiff MATHIS's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED to the extent that the case may proceed without the prepayment of the entire filing fee, and the Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. Plaintiff MATHIS is advised that no further action will be taken in this case until the initial partial filing fee of $120.60 is paid in full, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/10/2021. (cmc)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/8/2021. (cmc)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JANIIS MATHIS, LAWRENCE MICHAELS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by LAWRENCE MICHAELS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by LAWRENCE MICHAELS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LAWRENCE MICHAELS. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Authorization by Prisoner, #3 Envelope) (jv)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JANIIS MATHIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JANIIS MATHIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JANIIS MATHIS. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Authorization of Prisoner Form, #3 Envelope) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATHIS et al v. CARNEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANIIS MATHIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE MICHAELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAIRE DEMATTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRY PHELPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID PIERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN D. WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHEAL ZAKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY BUZAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELASANDROS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COULEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?