Bryant v. Koninkelijke Philips, NV et al
Plaintiff: Kelli Bryant
Defendant: Koninkelijke Philips NV, PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC. and PHILIPS HOLDING USA INC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01587
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER #6. As more fully set forth in the attached order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following individuals are appointed as interim lead counsel to serve with the six individuals named as interim lead counsel in Pretrial Order #2: Dennis Damonn Spurling and Shanon J. Carson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appointment of the foregoing counsel as interim lead counsel is made in accordance with Pretrial Order #2, including the duties and responsibilities of the interim lead counsel set forth in Pretrial Order #2. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/21/2021. (sms)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER #5: The schedule for the court's selection of the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, lead counsel, and liaison counsel is as follows: (1) Applications Due - 1/4/2022; (2) Objections Due - 1/11/2022; and (3) Responses to Objections Due - 1/18/2022. Interviews will take place on January 27, 2022, at 2:00 p.m., and, if necessary, January 28, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. in person at the courthouse in Judge Conti's courtroom. The applications, objections, and responses must comply with paragraph 14 of Pretrial Order #1. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/20/2021. (sms)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER #4. As more fully set forth in the attached order: the deadline for the parties to file a proposed interim preservation order, originally established in Pretrial Order No. 2, is hereby extended until Thursday, December 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/14/2021. (sms)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/10/2021. (sms)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/10/2021. (sms)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER #3. As more fully set forth in the attached order: the Initial Status Conference will take place on 12/15/2021 at 02:00 PM; the dial-in number for the initial status conference, which shall be used by any individual who wants to listen to the initial status conference, but not participate in the conference, is 888-363-4749, and the access code is 1490596; the court will email the information for participation in the initial status conference via videoconferencing to any attorney of record who files a motion for alternative method to appear and whose motion is granted by the court. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/1/2021. (sms)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER #2 with Respect to (1) Interim Modifications to the Preservation Requirements and (2) Appointment of Interim Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for the Purpose of Negotiating an Interim Proposed Preservation Order, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/19/2021. (sms)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Initial Status Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Motions to appear by an alternative method and Notices of any plaintiff appearing through a designated attorney instead of the plaintiff's attorney of record are due by 12/8/2021 as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/10/2021. (sms)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-12439. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Transfer to the Western District of Pennsylvania for MDL 3014 (SSch)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-2) to Western District of Pennsylvania for MDL # 3014. (SSch)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-2) for MDL # 3014. [Informational Copy] (SSch)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Kelli Bryant of Potential Tag-Along Action (Attachments: #1 Case Docket Sheet and Complaint, #2 Proof of Service) (Oliver, Alyson)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TTho)
October 18, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kelli Bryant against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8654603 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Lenawee - County Where Action Arose: Lenawee - County of 1st Defendant: Amsterdam. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Oliver, Alyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Koninkelijke Philips, NV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Bryant
Represented By: Alyson L. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninkelijke Philips NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS HOLDING USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?