CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOLS OF THE DIOCESE OF PITTSBURGH, INC. et al v. FEDERATION OF PITTSBURGH DIOCESAN TEACHERS
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOLS OF THE DIOCESE OF PITTSBURGH, INC. and SETON LASALLE HIGH SCHOOL, INC.
Defendant: FEDERATION OF PITTSBURGH DIOCESAN TEACHERS
Case Number: 2:2021cv01808
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support re #13 Motion to Dismiss Count II of Defendant's Counterclaim filed by CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOLS OF THE DIOCESE OF PITTSBURGH, INC., SETON LASALLE HIGH SCHOOL, INC.. (Thomas, James)
January 24, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Defendant's Counterclaim by CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOLS OF THE DIOCESE OF PITTSBURGH, INC., SETON LASALLE HIGH SCHOOL, INC.. (Thomas, James)
January 5, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Ruxton on behalf of CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOLS OF THE DIOCESE OF PITTSBURGH, INC., SETON LASALLE HIGH SCHOOL, INC.. (Ruxton, Andrew)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order re #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOLS OF THE DIOCESE OF PITTSBURGH, INC., SETON LASALLE HIGH SCHOOL, INC. Plaintiffs' Response to #7 ANSWER to 1 Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by FEDERATION OF PITTSBURGH DIOCESAN TEACHERS, is due by 1/24/22. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/5/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOLS OF THE DIOCESE OF PITTSBURGH, INC., SETON LASALLE HIGH SCHOOL, INC. Answer due from Plaintiffs 1/24/22 per Order 11 . (Thomas, James) Detailed information added to docket entry from Order 11 . Modified text on 1/5/2022. (cww)
January 3, 2022 Filing 9 Errata re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by FEDERATION OF PITTSBURGH DIOCESAN TEACHERS. Reason for Correction: Ink signature vs. /s/. (Orsatti, Benjamin)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FEDERATION OF PITTSBURGH DIOCESAN TEACHERS. Waiver sent 12/20/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (Orsatti, Benjamin)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by FEDERATION OF PITTSBURGH DIOCESAN TEACHERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Orsatti, Benjamin) Refiled at #9 . Document hidden from public view. Modified text on 1/4/2022. (cww)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FEDERATION OF PITTSBURGH DIOCESAN TEACHERS. FEDERATION OF PITTSBURGH DIOCESAN TEACHERS waiver sent on 12/16/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (Orsatti, Benjamin) Refiled at #8 . Document hidden from public view. Modified text on 1/3/2022. (cww)
December 16, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Waiver of Service Executed. ERROR: Case number of document does not match case number of case. CORRECTION: Attorney is directed to file an Errata with corrected case number. (cww)
December 16, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. ERROR: Typed name omitted by s/. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event. (cww)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOLS OF THE DIOCESE OF PITTSBURGH, INC., SETON LASALLE HIGH SCHOOL, INC.. (Thomas, James)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 12/10/21. (jg)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERATION OF PITTSBURGH DIOCESAN TEACHERS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number BPAWDC-6847912), filed by CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOLS OF THE DIOCESE OF PITTSBURGH, INC., SETON LASALLE HIGH SCHOOL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (cww)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOLS OF THE DIOCESE OF PITTSBURGH, INC. et al v. FEDERATION OF PITTSBURGH DIOCESAN TEACHERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOLS OF THE DIOCESE OF PITTSBURGH, INC.
Represented By: James P Thomas
Represented By: Andrew J. Ruxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SETON LASALLE HIGH SCHOOL, INC.
Represented By: James P Thomas
Represented By: Andrew J. Ruxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERATION OF PITTSBURGH DIOCESAN TEACHERS
Represented By: Benjamin Ernest Orsatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?