JOHNSON v. PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: CHERYL JOHNSON
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY formerly doing business as PROGRESSIVE
Case Number: 2:2021cv01916
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER approving #28 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by CHERYL JOHNSON Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/13/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CHERYL JOHNSON. (Monbaron, Kathryn)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER it appearing to the Court that the parties have agreed to an amicable resolution of this matter, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall remove this case from the docket for administrative purposes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that, in the event either party fails to execute the settlement agreement, the case shall be reinstated to the docket upon written request of either party for purposes of enforcement of the settlement agreement. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement of the parties. Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of Court or notice on the matter. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/9/22. (Schwab, Arthur)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #24 Motion for CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. The Motion is denied as this Court does not find that there is a "substantial ground for difference of opinion" as explained in great detail in the Court's opinion filed at ECF no. 20. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/8/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lmt)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 BRIEF in Support re #24 Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal filed by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dapper, Kathleen) Modified text on 3/8/2022. (lar)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dapper, Kathleen)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER setting Initial Case Management set for 4/20/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due 4/12/22. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/24/22. (lck)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying as moot #18 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/23/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lmt)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/23/2022. (lmt)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/23/2022. (lmt)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 BRIEF in Opposition re #18 Motion to Stay filed by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dapper, Kathleen)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by CHERYL JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Monbaron, Kathryn)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Stay Proceedings. Plaintiff shall file her Motion to Stay on or before February 10, 2022. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay shall be filed by February 11, 2022. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/9/2022. (lmt)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Proposed Order re #15 Motion for Leave to File to File Motion to Stay Proceedings by CHERYL JOHNSON. (Monbaron, Kathryn)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Stay Proceedings by CHERYL JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Stay Proceedings) (Monbaron, Kathryn)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Supplemental BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dapper, Kathleen) Modified text on 2/3/2022 to correct title. (lar)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Supplemental Brief shall be filed on ECF no later than 2/4/22. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/2/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Dapper, Kathleen)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dapper, Kathleen)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CHERYL JOHNSON. (Olcott, Douglas)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO #5 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by CHERYL JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Olcott, Douglas) Modified text on 1/19/2022 to add linkage. (lar)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY - Response due by 1/18/2022 and Reply brief due by 1/21/2022. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/7/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposed Order re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dapper, Kathleen)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dapper, Kathleen)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance) (Dapper, Kathleen)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/6/22. (ms)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying The Progressive Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (lar)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-21-014565 Copies attached: Complaint, Notice to Defend, Praecipe for Appearance, Acceptance of Service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6877295), filed by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL JOHNSON
Represented By: Douglas J. Olcott
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Represented By: Kathryn C. Monbaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY formerly doing business as PROGRESSIVE
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Represented By: Kathleen P. Dapper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?