KRAVETZ et al v. KONINKELIJKE PHILIPS N.V. et al
Plaintiff: JOHN KRAVETZ, JANET KRAVETZ and JOHN K. KRAVETZ
Defendant: KONINKELIJKE PHILIPS N.V., PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, PHILIPS HOLDING USA, INC. and PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00020
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER #9. ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE for 3/22/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/23/2022. (sms)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER #8: ORDER APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL, PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE, CO-LIAISON COUNSEL, AND CERTAIN COMMITTEE AND SUBCOMMITTEE CHAIRS AND MEMBERS. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/15/2022. (sms)
February 8, 2022 Filing 13 TOLLING AGREEMENT. (sms)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL ORDER #7. ORDER MAKING TOLLING AGREEMENT AVAILABLE ON COURT'S WEBSITE. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/8/2022. (sms)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERIM PRESERVATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 1/11/2022. (sms)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER #6. As more fully set forth in the attached order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following individuals are appointed as interim lead counsel to serve with the six individuals named as interim lead counsel in Pretrial Order #2: Dennis Damonn Spurling and Shanon J. Carson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appointment of the foregoing counsel as interim lead counsel is made in accordance with Pretrial Order #2, including the duties and responsibilities of the interim lead counsel set forth in Pretrial Order #2. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/21/2021. (sms)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER #5: The schedule for the court's selection of the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, lead counsel, and liaison counsel is as follows: (1) Applications Due - 1/4/2022; (2) Objections Due - 1/11/2022; and (3) Responses to Objections Due - 1/18/2022. Interviews will take place on January 27, 2022, at 2:00 p.m., and, if necessary, January 28, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. in person at the courthouse in Judge Conti's courtroom. The applications, objections, and responses must comply with paragraph 14 of Pretrial Order #1. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/20/2021. (sms)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER #4. As more fully set forth in the attached order: the deadline for the parties to file a proposed interim preservation order, originally established in Pretrial Order No. 2, is hereby extended until Thursday, December 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/14/2021. (sms)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/10/2021. (sms)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/10/2021. (sms)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER #3. As more fully set forth in the attached order: the Initial Status Conference will take place on 12/15/2021 at 02:00 PM; the dial-in number for the initial status conference, which shall be used by any individual who wants to listen to the initial status conference, but not participate in the conference, is 888-363-4749, and the access code is 1490596; the court will email the information for participation in the initial status conference via videoconferencing to any attorney of record who files a motion for alternative method to appear and whose motion is granted by the court. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/1/2021. (sms)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDER #2 with Respect to (1) Interim Modifications to the Preservation Requirements and (2) Appointment of Interim Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for the Purpose of Negotiating an Interim Proposed Preservation Order, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/19/2021. (sms)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Initial Status Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Motions to appear by an alternative method and Notices of any plaintiff appearing through a designated attorney instead of the plaintiff's attorney of record are due by 12/8/2021 as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/10/2021. (sms)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to KONINKELIJKE PHILIPS N.V., PHILIPS HOLDING USA, INC., PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons PHILIPS HOLDING USA, INC., #2 Summons PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, #3 Summons PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC) (lyk)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KONINKELIJKE PHILIPS N.V., PHILIPS HOLDING USA, INC., PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6884084), filed by JANET KRAVETZ, JOHN KRAVETZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lyk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRAVETZ et al v. KONINKELIJKE PHILIPS N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN KRAVETZ
Represented By: Joyce Chambers Reichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET KRAVETZ
Represented By: Joyce Chambers Reichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN K. KRAVETZ
Represented By: Joyce Chambers Reichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KONINKELIJKE PHILIPS N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS HOLDING USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?