Barnes v. Koninklijke Philips NV et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Barnes, Sr
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V, PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, PHILIPS HOLDING USA INC and PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00385
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The status conferences scheduled for various dates at 4:00 p.m., pursuant to PRETRIAL ORDER #12, are hereby rescheduled to 3:00 p.m. on the same dates as set forth in Pretrial Order #12. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/27/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Motion of Attorney Ruth Anne French-Hodson to Withdraw from Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/20/2022. (sms)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/1/2022. (sms)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL ORDER #13 RE: COMMON BENEFIT ORDER REGARDING PROTOCOLS FOR PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL TIME AND EXPENSE SUBMISSIONS; Amended MOTION of Co-Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Time and Expense Sub-Committee for Entry of a Common Benefit Order Regarding Protocols for Plaintiffs' Counsel Time and Expense Submissions granted by instant order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 3/24/2022. (sms)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL ORDER #12 SCHEDULING MONTHLY STATUS CONFERENCES as set forth more fully in the order; The schedule of status conferences is subject to change at the discretion of the court, and any changes will be made on the court's docket at 21-mc-1230; Subject to any limitations imposed by reason of future COVID-19 restrictions, all scheduled status conferences shall be held in person at the Joseph F. Weis, Jr. United States Courthouse, 700 Grant Street, Pittsburgh, PA; Co-lead plaintiffs' counsel and counsel for defendants shall meet and confer, and, at least two business days prior to each status conference, file with the court an agreed-upon proposed agenda for the status conference; If the agreed-upon proposed agenda for a status conference does not include substantive, complex, or disputed matters, two business days prior to the status conference, the parties may file a joint motion to request the status conference be conducted via telephone or videoconference. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 3/24/2022. (sms)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL ORDER #11 RE: TRANSCRIPTS OF ALL PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 3/24/2022. (sms)
March 22, 2022 Minute Entry for In-Person Status Conference held on 3/22/2022 before Judge Joy Flowers Conti: The court addressed the matters set forth in the proposed joint agenda and other matters as set forth on the record. Co-lead counsel advised about the filing of consolidated complaints and consented to the denial without prejudice of the pending motion to file an amended complaint (Civ. A. No. 22-130, ECF No. 26) and granting the pending voluntary dismissals (Civ. A. Nos. 21-1443, 21-1796, 22-222, 22-223). The court advised the parties about the selection of special masters and mediators and filing proposed appointment orders. The court set the next status conference for 4/20/2022 at 4:00 p.m. The court will enter orders setting monthly status conferences and ordering transcripts. (Court Reporter: Deborah Rowe) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRETRIAL ORDER #10 with Respect to In-Person Hearings. As more fully set forth in the attached Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that unless otherwise noted all proceedings before this court will be conducted in person and neither a dial-in number nor videoconferencing will be provided to the counsel or general public for the proceedings. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 3/17/2022. (sms)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Modifying Deadline to Submit Identifying Information to the Preservation Registry under Paragraph 24 of the Interim Preservation Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 3/7/2022. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER #9. ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE for 3/22/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/23/2022. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL ORDER #8: ORDER APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL, PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE, CO-LIAISON COUNSEL, AND CERTAIN COMMITTEE AND SUBCOMMITTEE CHAIRS AND MEMBERS. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/15/2022. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Filing 18 TOLLING AGREEMENT. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL ORDER #7. ORDER MAKING TOLLING AGREEMENT AVAILABLE ON COURT'S WEBSITE. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/8/2022. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INTERIM PRESERVATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 1/11/2022. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER #6. As more fully set forth in the attached order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following individuals are appointed as interim lead counsel to serve with the six individuals named as interim lead counsel in Pretrial Order #2: Dennis Damonn Spurling and Shanon J. Carson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appointment of the foregoing counsel as interim lead counsel is made in accordance with Pretrial Order #2, including the duties and responsibilities of the interim lead counsel set forth in Pretrial Order #2. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/21/2021. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER #5: The schedule for the court's selection of the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, lead counsel, and liaison counsel is as follows: (1) Applications Due - 1/4/2022; (2) Objections Due - 1/11/2022; and (3) Responses to Objections Due - 1/18/2022. Interviews will take place on January 27, 2022, at 2:00 p.m., and, if necessary, January 28, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. in person at the courthouse in Judge Conti's courtroom. The applications, objections, and responses must comply with paragraph 14 of Pretrial Order #1. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/20/2021. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER #4. As more fully set forth in the attached order: the deadline for the parties to file a proposed interim preservation order, originally established in Pretrial Order No. 2, is hereby extended until Thursday, December 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/14/2021. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/10/2021. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/10/2021. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER #3. As more fully set forth in the attached order: the Initial Status Conference will take place on 12/15/2021 at 02:00 PM; the dial-in number for the initial status conference, which shall be used by any individual who wants to listen to the initial status conference, but not participate in the conference, is 888-363-4749, and the access code is 1490596; the court will email the information for participation in the initial status conference via videoconferencing to any attorney of record who files a motion for alternative method to appear and whose motion is granted by the court. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/1/2021. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER #2 with Respect to (1) Interim Modifications to the Preservation Requirements and (2) Appointment of Interim Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for the Purpose of Negotiating an Interim Proposed Preservation Order, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/19/2021. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Initial Status Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Motions to appear by an alternative method and Notices of any plaintiff appearing through a designated attorney instead of the plaintiff's attorney of record are due by 12/8/2021 as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/10/2021. (sms)
March 3, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00391. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order of MDL Transfer to District of Pennsylvania Western. MDL case number is 3014. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(jeg)
March 2, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 3014. (jeg)
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Koninklijke Philips NV, Philips Holding USA Inc., Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(jeg)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet and Summons forms. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
February 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Koninklijke Philips NV, Philips Holding USA Inc., Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9235042) filed by Eddie Barnes, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Exhibit)Attorney Joseph S. Piacun added to party Eddie Barnes, Sr(pty:pla).(Piacun, Joseph) (Attachments 1-5 replaced on 2/17/2022) (jeg). Modified text on 2/17/2022 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Koninklijke Philips NV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Barnes, Sr
Represented By: Joseph S. Piacun
Represented By: Reid Scott Uzee
Represented By: William Joseph Guste, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS HOLDING USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?