PHILLIPS v. CITY OF PITTSBURGH et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR.
Defendant: CITY OF PITTSBURGH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA and RICHARD JAMES
Case Number: 2:2022cv00400
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: W Scott Hardy
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Emergency Housing by JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR. (lyk)
April 25, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue by JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (lyk)
March 25, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 Order filed by JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (lyk)
March 24, 2022 Filing 11 Remark: Correspondence to the Court by JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR. (lyk)
March 24, 2022 Filing 10 AUDIO/VISUAL EXHIBIT(S) in support of #9 Response by JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR received. Physical media forwarded to chambers of Judge Hardy. (lyk)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating as follows: #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted; Plaintiff's Complaint (Docket No. 1-1) is dismissed without prejudice to amendment to the extent that Plaintiff is able to state a plausible claim for relief; to the extent Plaintiff wishes to file an Amended Complaint, he must do so by 3/24/22, otherwise the case will be closed; and, given that Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed, his contemporaneously filed #3 Motion for Modifications to Rules, #4 Motion for Midland Credit Management to be Added, #5 Motion for Asylum, #6 Motion for Return of Property, and #7 Motion for Reparations are denied as moot without prejudice. See Memorandum Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 3/9/22. (kw)
March 7, 2022 Judge W. Scott Hardy presiding. (lar)
March 7, 2022 Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. (lar)
March 4, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Reparations by JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR. (lyk)
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Return of Property by JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR. (lyk)
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Asylum by JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR. (lyk)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Midland Credit Management to be added by JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR. (lyk)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Modifications to Rules by JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR. (lyk)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR. (lyk)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B.1, #5 Exhibit B.2, #6 Exhibit B.X, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit CA, #9 Exhibit CB, #10 Exhibit C4, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit F, #14 Exhibit G, #15 Exhibit H, #16 Civil Cover Sheet) (lyk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILLIPS v. CITY OF PITTSBURGH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH D.S. PHILLIPS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PITTSBURGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?