UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PERRY HOMES, INC.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: PERRY HOMES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00526
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Filing 48 Joint MOTION to Approve and Enter Proposed Consent Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Jacqueline)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/27/2022. (cmc)
December 26, 2022 Filing 46 REPORT of Mediation: Case has been resolved. JUDITH K. FITZGERALD terminated. Attorney Judith K. Fitzgerald terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed #here or at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 12/21/2022. (Fitzgerald, Judith)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Joint MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is STAYED for thirty (30) days, or until 12/23/2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Case Management Order is amended, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/23/2022. (cmc)
November 23, 2022 Reset Deadlines and Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 12/29/2022; Fact Discovery due by 3/29/2023; ADR due by 12/29/2022; Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 1/11/2023 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/5/2023 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. (cmc)
November 22, 2022 Filing 44 Joint MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Jacqueline)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Confidentiality Agreement; Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/28/2022. (mrm)
October 27, 2022 Filing 42 Errata re #41 Errata by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Reason for Correction: Incorrect Judge's signature. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Jacqueline)
October 24, 2022 Filing 41 Errata re #39 Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Agreementf, Motion for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Reason for Correction: Incorrect Proposed Order Attached. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Jacqueline) Link added to Errata filed at #42 ; Modified on 11/1/2022 (ctb). Modified on 11/3/2022 (ept).
October 24, 2022 Filing 40 STIPULATION Regarding Electronically Stored Information and Document Production by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Brown, Jacqueline)
October 24, 2022 Filing 39 Joint MOTION Entry of Confidentiality Agreement , MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Brown, Jacqueline) Link added to Errata filed at #42 ; Modified on 11/1/2022 (ctb).
October 10, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Deanna Istik on behalf of PERRY HOMES, INC.. (Istik, Deanna)
October 5, 2022 Filing 37 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by PERRY HOMES, INC.. (Hunt, Richard)
October 2, 2022 Filing 36 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Pepper, Beth)
September 30, 2022 Filing 35 AMENDED DOCUMENT STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Amendment to #30 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. (Pepper, Beth)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. The Honorable Judith K. Fitzgerald is appointed as mediator. Party JUDITH K. FITZGERALD added. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/30/2022. (cmc)
September 30, 2022 Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2022; Fact Discovery due by 2/27/2023; ADR due by 11/29/2022; Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/1/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/8/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/30/2022. (cmc)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/30/2022. (cmc)
September 30, 2022 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/30/2022, as more fully set forth in the attached entry. (Court Reporter: none) (cmc)
September 27, 2022 Filing 30 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Pepper, Beth)
September 22, 2022 Filing 29 Proposed Case Management Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Pepper, Beth)
September 22, 2022 Filing 28 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pepper, Beth)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict with the Court, the Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2022 is hereby rescheduled to 9/30/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/14/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc) Modified on 9/14/2022 to include original date of conference (cmc).
September 6, 2022 Filing 26 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PERRY HOMES, INC.. (Hunt, Richard)
September 6, 2022 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER re #24 Motion to Amend Answer to Complaint. Defendant's motion to amend answer to complaint is granted and Defendant shall file the Amended Answer at ECF No. [24-1] as the Amended Answer. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/6/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mrm)
September 5, 2022 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by PERRY HOMES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave) (Hunt, Richard)
September 2, 2022 Filing 23 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PERRY HOMES, INC.. (Hunt, Richard)
August 18, 2022 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Answer #8 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a responsive pleading to the Counterclaim on or before 9/9/2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/18/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
August 17, 2022 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Answer #8 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Pepper, Beth) Modified on 8/17/2022 to change event type from Motion for Extension of Time to Motion for Leave to File and to create link (ctb).
August 16, 2022 Filing 20 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 9/8/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report, Proposed Case Management Order, ADR Stipulation, Willingness to Proceed before Magistrate Judge, and Confidential Position Letters due by 9/26/2022, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/16/2022. (cmc)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Beth Pepper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/30/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Eddy, J.)
June 29, 2022 Filing 18 Proposed Order re: #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Pepper, Beth) Modified on 6/29/2022 (lar).
June 29, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Beth Pepper to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (lar)
June 29, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #16 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as MOTION for attorney Beth Pepper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This message is for informational purposes only. (lar)
June 29, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. ACTION REQUIRED! (lar)
June 28, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Pepper on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Pepper, Beth) Modified on 6/29/2022 to remove from public view. Document refiled as MOTION for attorney Beth Pepper to Appear Pro Hac Vice at #17 . (lar).
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Richard M. Hunt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/14/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
June 13, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary T. Vanasdale on behalf of PERRY HOMES, INC.. (Vanasdale, Gary)
June 8, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Richard M. Hunt to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7144170) by PERRY HOMES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Hunt Affidavit, #2 Exhibit to Hunt Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order) (Hunt, Richard)
June 7, 2022 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER striking #10 Motion for Richard M. Hunt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney is advised to resubmit his motion including a more recent and unexpired Certificate of Good Standing. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/7/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
June 6, 2022 Filing 11 Proposed Order re #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by PERRY HOMES, INC.. (Hunt, Richard)
June 6, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Richard M. Hunt to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7138308) by PERRY HOMES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hunt Affidavit, #2 Exhibit to Hunt Affidavit) (Hunt, Richard) Modified on 6/6/2022 (lar).
June 6, 2022 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PERRY HOMES, INC.. (Hunt, Richard)
June 6, 2022 Filing 8 Errata re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by PERRY HOMES, INC.. Reason for Correction: signature. (Hunt, Richard)
June 6, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. ERROR: Typed name omitted by s/ (name). CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, s/ (name) using Errata event. ACTION REQUIRED! (lar)
June 6, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 6/13/2022. (lar)
June 6, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question #10 . (lar)
June 4, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by PERRY HOMES, INC. (Hunt, Richard) Modified on 6/6/2022 to remove from public view. Answer refiled as Errata at #8 . (lar).
May 6, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. PERRY HOMES, INC. waiver sent on 4/5/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Brown, Jacqueline)
April 13, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE on Consolidation by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 4 Order to Show Cause (Brown, Jacqueline)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon review of the cases filed at United States of America v. Perry Homes, Inc. (21-cv-977) and United States of America v. Perry Homes, Inc. (22-cv-526), it appears that these matters involve a common question of law or fact. Fed. Rule Civ. Pro. 42(a). Accordingly, this Court orders the parties to show cause by 4/22/2022 as to why this Court should not consolidate these cases pursuant to Fed. Rule Civ. Pro. 42(a)(2). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/8/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mrm)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/6/2022. (cmc)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PERRY HOMES, INC. (lar)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PERRY HOMES, INC., filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PERRY HOMES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jacqueline Brown
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Brown
Represented By: Beth Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRY HOMES, INC.
Represented By: Richard M Hunt
Represented By: Deanna Istik
Represented By: Gary T. Vanasdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?