SULEIMAN v. CARDONA et al
Plaintiff: ELLEN SULEIMAN
Defendant: MIGUEL CARDONA and THE OFFICE OF FEDERAL STUDENT AID
Case Number: 2:2022cv00736
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ELLEN SULEIMAN. THE OFFICE OF FEDERAL STUDENT AID served on 5/31/2022. (Sheats, Mary)
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ELLEN SULEIMAN, MIGUEL CARDONA served on (no date entered). (Sheats, Mary) Modified on 6/22/2022 (lar).
May 19, 2022 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (cjo)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/19/22. (cjo)
May 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MIGUEL CARDONA, THE OFFICE OF FEDERAL STUDENT AID (Attachments: #1 Summons) (lar)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MIGUEL CARDONA, THE OFFICE OF FEDERAL STUDENT AID (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7107336), filed by ELLEN SULEIMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SULEIMAN v. CARDONA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLEN SULEIMAN
Represented By: Mary Bower Sheats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIGUEL CARDONA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OFFICE OF FEDERAL STUDENT AID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?