MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, INC., VIATRIS, INC., MYLAN TEORANTA, NATCO PHARMA, LTD. and GLAND PHARMA, LTD.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00750
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Todd L. Krause to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/11/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
July 11, 2022 Filing 30 Errata re #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Reason for Correction: Attached wrong affidavit. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit) (Krause, Todd)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Vi T. Tran to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/8/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Motion for John M. Desmarais to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/8/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Henry L. Ard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/8/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Sumeet Dang to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/8/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Alyssa B. Monsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/8/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
July 8, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for attorney Vi T. Tran to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7188163) by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit) (Tran, Vi)
July 8, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for attorney John M. Desmarais to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7188149) by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit) (Desmarais, John)
July 8, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Todd L. Krause to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7188133) by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit) (Krause, Todd). Modified on 7/11/2022, link added to Errata filed at #30 (dmh).
July 8, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for attorney Henry L. Ard to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7188129) by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit) (Ard, Henry)
July 8, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for attorney Sumeet Dang to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7188125) by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit) (Dang, Sumeet)
July 8, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Alyssa B. Monsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7188107) by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit) (Monsen, Alyssa)
June 24, 2022 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. NATCO PHARMA, LTD. waiver sent on 6/21/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (Boucek, Carolyn)
June 24, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. MYLAN TEORANTA waiver sent on 6/21/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (Boucek, Carolyn)
June 24, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. GLAND PHARMA, LTD. waiver sent on 6/21/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (Boucek, Carolyn)
June 24, 2022 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from GLAND PHARMA, LTD. on 9/19/2022; MYLAN TEORANTA on 9/19/2022; NATCO PHARMA, LTD. on 9/19/2022 (dmh)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint . Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Inc., and Viatris Inc. shall answer or respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before September 19, 2022. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 6/21/22. (cjo)
June 21, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, INC., VIATRIS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pietragallo, William)
June 10, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to GLAND PHARMA, LTD., MYLAN TEORANTA, NATCO PHARMA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (cel)
June 7, 2022 Filing 12 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Boucek, Carolyn)
June 1, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. VIATRIS, INC. served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Boucek, Carolyn)
June 1, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. MYLAN, INC. served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Boucek, Carolyn)
June 1, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Boucek, Carolyn)
May 26, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, INC., and VIATRIS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (dmh)
May 25, 2022 Filing 7 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (cjo)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/25/22. (cjo)
May 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
May 25, 2022 Filing 4 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Boucek, Carolyn)
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Owens Boucek on behalf of MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Boucek, Carolyn)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (dmh)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLAND PHARMA, LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN TEORANTA, MYLAN, INC., NATCO PHARMA, LTD., VIATRIS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7113618), filed by MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67) (dmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Edward C Flynn
Represented By: Alyssa Monsen
Represented By: Carolyn Owens Boucek
Represented By: Henry Lassister Ard
Represented By: John Desmarais
Represented By: Sumeet Dang
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Krause
Represented By: Vi Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN, INC.
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIATRIS, INC.
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN TEORANTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATCO PHARMA, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAND PHARMA, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?