STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC v. STUDENT PAINTERS INC.
Plaintiff: STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC
Defendant: STUDENT PAINTERS INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00855
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE Of Service of Court Order (Dkt 19) and Court Email by STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC re #19 Order,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, (Carswell, Chanille)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 16 Addendum in Support,. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Brief in Support. This message is for informational purposes only. (elt)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #17 Motion for Default Judgment, Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC : Video Hearing, Argument and taking of evidence is set for 9/12/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. Plaintiff is to file a Brief in Support Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction against Defendant Student Painters Inc., the names of proposed witnesses and a list of proposed exhibits by August 22, 2022. Defendant Student Painters Inc. is to file a Response Brief, names of proposed witnesses and a list of proposed exhibits by August 29, 2022. Presence of any counsel for and representatives of Student Painters, Inc. at this Hearing is required. Details more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/2/22. (cjo)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Amended) by STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC re #17 Motion for Default Judgment, Motion for Permanent Injunction (Carswell, Chanille)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #15 Request for Default Judgment. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction #17 . This message is for informational purposes only. (ctb)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 BRIEF in Support re #17 Motion for Default Judgment, Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit B Declaration of Acron, #3 Exhibit C SPI Website, #4 Exhibit D App. No. 90692322, #5 Exhibit E Reg. No. 6648690, #6 Exhibit F SPI Business Registration) (elt)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Default Judgment against STUDENT PAINTERS INC., MOTION for Permanent Injunction by STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (ctb)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REQUEST by STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC for entry of DEFAULT JUDGMENT against STUDENT PAINTERS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Permanent Injunction) (Carswell, Chanille) Wrong event selected; document removed from public view and refiled at #17 Modified on 7/29/2022 (ctb).
July 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to STUDENT PAINTERS INC. (elt)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST by STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC for entry of DEFAULT against STUDENT PAINTERS INC. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Chanille Carswell, #2 Proposed Order) (Carswell, Chanille)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC. STUDENT PAINTERS INC. served on 6/16/2022, answer due 7/7/2022. (Clark, Bryan)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Chanille Carswell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 6/17/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Chanille Carswell to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7158344) by STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Chanille Carswell) (Carswell, Chanille)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Exhibits are to be made separate attachments. This message is for informational purposes only. CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (cww)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Docket Sheet) (dmh)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (cjo)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 6/13/22. (cjo)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, the Clerk of Court shall reassign this matter to another Judge on this Court. Judge Nora Barry Fischer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/10/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecilia R. Dickson on behalf of STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC. (Dickson, Cecilia)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to STUDENT PAINTERS INC. (elt)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Robert J. Colville added. (ijh)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC. (elt)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STUDENT PAINTERS INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7146127), filed by STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (elt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC v. STUDENT PAINTERS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STUDENT PAINTERS-MICHIGAN LLC
Represented By: Bryan P. Clark
Represented By: Cecilia R. Dickson
Represented By: Chanille B. Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUDENT PAINTERS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?