PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC. v. FRANTZEN
Counter Defendant: PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC.
Counter Claimant: JACOB FRANTZEN
3Rd Party Defendant: GREG BURNS and JOE BIELAWSKI
Case Number: 2:2022cv01050
Filed: July 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Referring Judge: Christy Criswell Wiegand
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JACOB FRANTZEN (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Tallman, James)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 BRIEF in Support re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by JOE BIELAWSKI, GREG BURNS, PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Del Sole, Stephen)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant/Counterclaim-Plaintiff Jacob Frantzen's Counterclaim re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by JOE BIELAWSKI, GREG BURNS, PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Meet and Confer, #2 Proposed Order) (Del Sole, Stephen)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Devine, Bryan)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R. Bruno on behalf of JOE BIELAWSKI, GREG BURNS, PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC.. (Bruno, Jonathan)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Del Sole on behalf of JOE BIELAWSKI, GREG BURNS. (Del Sole, Stephen)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Greg Burns, Joe Bielawski, filed by JACOB FRANTZEN. (Tallman, James)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Order to Show Cause, filed by PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Del Sole, Stephen)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, and COUNTERCLAIM against PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC. by JACOB FRANTZEN. (Tallman, James)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause by 9/2/2022 as to why the action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, or shall request an entry of default as to Defendant. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 8/25/2022. (jmm)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jmm)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 7/27/2022. (jmm)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge recused. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 7/25/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand added. (ijh)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Butler County, case number 22-10422 with Jury Demand filed by JACOB FRANTZEN. Copies attached: Complaint, Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Order of Court, (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7209060). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (cel) Modified on 7/22/2022 to include amount of demand and copies of state pleadings (dmh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC. v. FRANTZEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Bryan C. Devine
Represented By: Stephen J. Del Sole
Represented By: Jonathan R. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: JACOB FRANTZEN
Represented By: James T. Tallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: GREG BURNS
Represented By: Stephen J. Del Sole
Represented By: Jonathan R. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: JOE BIELAWSKI
Represented By: Stephen J. Del Sole
Represented By: Jonathan R. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?