Anthony v. Chromalox, Inc
Plaintiff: RONALD ANTHONY
Defendant: Chromalox Inc and CHROMALOX, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01119
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall Show Cause why the Complaint in this matter should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, the deadline for the filing of a response to the motion to dismiss having passed. Show Cause Response due by 9/22/2022 Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 9/13/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kld)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Klaber on behalf of CHROMALOX, INC.. (Klaber, David)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 BRIEF in Support re #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CHROMALOX, INC.. (Feczko, Mark)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Notice of Disclosure, by CHROMALOX, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Feczko, Mark)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (cjo)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/2/22. (cjo)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00202. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #12 with relief different than requested and TRANSFERS this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/1/2022. (shk)
May 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Fleming, Randy)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Fleming, Randy)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Defendant Chromalox, Inc.'s Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint] filed by Chromalox Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Glavin, Daniel)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE: Due to the backlog of criminal cases caused by the pandemic, it is unlikely that the assigned district judge will schedule a trial date for this Hammond civil case until 2022 at the earliest. One or more parties previously declined to consent to the magistrate judge who was assigned this case for scheduling purposes before the close of discovery. The parties now have a second opportunity to consent to a Hammond magistrate judge for trial purposes. Rather than the previous random assignment of a magistrate judge, the parties can select which magistrate judge (Magistrate Judges John Martin, Joshua Kolar or Andrew Rodovich) they prefer to hear this case. All parties must agree on which magistrate judge will hear the case and file an Agreed Notice. Only one Agreed Notice should be filed for all parties in this case. Absent an agreement, the case will remain on the docket of the district judge. (ksc)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Chromalox Inc Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Notice)(Glavin, Daniel)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/12/2020. (tc)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Chromalox Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Second Barnes Declaration)(Glavin, Daniel)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 BRIEF re #16 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Fleming, Randy)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ronald Anthony. (Fleming, Randy)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Court GRANTS #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond is EXTENDED to 7/30/2020. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 7/9/2020. Text entry only. (tc)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Ronald Anthony. (Fleming, Randy)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 BRIEF in Support of #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Chromalox Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Bruce Barnes, #2 Exhibit 2 - June 11, 2020 Email, #3 Exhibit 3 - OSHA Safety Order and Notification of Penalty, #4 Exhibit 4 - May 2020 Email)(Glavin, Daniel)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Chromalox Inc. (Glavin, Daniel)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Laura K Veith PHV for Chromalox Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 6/5/2020. (ace)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark D Feczko PHV for Chromalox Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 6/5/2020. (ace)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Application for Attorney Mark D Feczko to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Chromalox, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4243929(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Application for Attorney Laura K Veith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Chromalox, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4243327(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED (docket sheet). State Court Case No. 45D05-2003-CT-000353. (rmf)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Chromalox Inc ; answer due by June 24, 2020. (Glavin, Daniel)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/22/2020. (tc)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. NEW CASE. (kjp)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chromalox Inc identifying Corporate Parent Spirax-Sarco Engineering PLC for Chromalox Inc.. (Glavin, Daniel)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W Glavin on behalf of Chromalox Inc (Glavin, Daniel)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4230922.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D05-2003-CT-00353, filed by Chromalox Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit B - Letter to Fleming, #4 Exhibit C - Letter from Fleming to DWG)(Glavin, Daniel)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Chromalox Inc, filed by Ronald Anthony, in Lake County Superior Court.(kjp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony v. Chromalox, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD ANTHONY
Represented By: Randy K Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chromalox Inc
Represented By: Laura K Veith PHV
Represented By: Mark D Feczko PHV
Represented By: Daniel W Glavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHROMALOX, INC.
Represented By: Laura K Veith PHV
Represented By: Mark D Feczko PHV
Represented By: David G. Klaber
Represented By: Mark D. Feczko
Represented By: Daniel W Glavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?