HASSON v. FULLSTORY, INC.
Plaintiff: KENNETH HASSON
Defendant: FULLSTORY, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01246
Filed: August 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Referring Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 USCA Case Number 23-2535 for #48 Notice of Appeal,, filed by KENNETH HASSON. USCA Case Manager Stephanie (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (sb3c)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #46 Memorandum Opinion,, #47 Order Dismissing Case, Terminate Motions, #44 Order, Memorandum Opinion, Terminate Motions, #45 Corrective Entry, by KENNETH HASSON. Filing fee $505, receipt number APAWDC-7846494. Motion for IFP N/A. Certificate of Appealability N/A. Court Reporter(s): N/A. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Etzel, Jamisen)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #27 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and denying #32 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is granted as to its Motion to Dismiss brought pursuant to 12(b)(2) and is denied as moot as to its Motion to Dismiss brought pursuant to 12(b)(6). Plaintiff is not granted leave to amend. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction is denied. The case is dismissed. The Clerk is to mark the case closed. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/25/2023. (dmm)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding #27 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and #32 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss will be granted as to its Motion to Dismiss brought pursuant to 12(b)(2) and will be denied as moot as to its Motion to Dismiss brought pursuant to 12(b)(6). Plaintiff will not be granted leave to amend. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction will be denied. The case will be dismissed. A separate Order to follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/25/2023. (dmm) Modified text on 7/25/2023. (dmm)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CORRECTIVE ENTRY regarding #44 Defendant's Opinion and Order regarding #29 Defendant's MOTION for Judicial Notice. Defendant's Motion is granted in part and denied in part as moot. Defendant's Motion is granted as to Exhibit 5, the Texas Secretary of State public record, but denied as moot as to Mattress Firm's pop-up consent banners and privacy policies. Wrong document attached to original entry. (dmm)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION AND ORDER regarding #29 Defendant's MOTION for Judicial Notice. Defendant's Motion is granted in part and denied in part as moot. Defendant's Motion is granted as to Exhibit 5, the Texas Secretary of State public record, but denied as moot as to Mattress Firm's pop-up consent banners and privacy policies. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/25/2023. (dmm) Document removed from public view and refiled at #45 Corrective Entry; Modified text on 7/26/2023. (ctb)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SUPPLEMENT by FULLSTORY, INC. to #27 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #28 Brief in Support of Motion, #37 Reply Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wolff, Peter)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN DOCKET MATTERS AND TRANSFERRING/REFERRING CERTAIN PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/15/2023. (sms)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Marilyn J. Horan added. Judge Robert J. Colville no longer assigned to case. (sms)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen Francis Raiola terminated. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/31/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw Stephen F. Raiola Appearance by FULLSTORY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wolff, Peter)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPLY BRIEF re #32 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction, #38 Response in Opposition re: Reply in Support of #32 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction filed by KENNETH HASSON. (Etzel, Jamisen)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #32 Motion for for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by FULLSTORY, INC. (Raiola, Stephen)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY BRIEF re #34 Brief in Opposition to #27 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, filed by FULLSTORY, INC. (Raiola, Stephen)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Modify. Defendants deadline to submit a reply in support of its motion to dismiss is extended to February 27, 2023 to coincide with Defendants deadline for filing its Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 2/14/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Modify Deadline for Filing Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by FULLSTORY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Raiola, Stephen)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 BRIEF in Opposition re #27 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by KENNETH HASSON. (Etzel, Jamisen)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 BRIEF in Support re #32 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction filed by KENNETH HASSON. (Etzel, Jamisen)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction by KENNETH HASSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Etzel, Jamisen)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to #30 Response to Motion re #29 Motion for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, filed by FULLSTORY, INC. (Raiola, Stephen) Modified text on 2/27/2023 to add document linkage. (ctb)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #29 MOTION for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, filed by KENNETH HASSON. (Lynch, Gary)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by FULLSTORY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Raiola, Stephen)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 BRIEF in Support re #27 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by FULLSTORY, INC.. (Raiola, Stephen)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim re #23 Amended Complaint by FULLSTORY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Raiola, Stephen). Added MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on 1/24/2023 (ctb)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FULLSTORY, INC.. (Raiola, Stephen)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Disclosure Statement by KENNETH HASSON. (Lynch, Gary)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Given the filing of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint #23 , Defendants Motions at #11 and #13 are hereby dismissed as moot. In accordance with the Courts Order at #22 , Defendant shall respond to the Amended Complaint by January 23, 2023. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 12/28/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #23 Amended Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2023. (ctb)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FULLSTORY, INC. FULLSTORY, INC. answer due 1/23/2023, filed by KENNETH HASSON. (Lynch, Gary)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing/Response Schedule filed by KENNETH HASSON. Plaintiff's Response or Amended Complaint is due by December 23, 2022. Defendant shall file any replies in support of its motions; or, if Plaintiff has amended the complaint, Defendant shall respond to the amended complaint, by January 23, 2023. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/15/22. (cjo)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing/Response Schedule by KENNETH HASSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lynch, Gary)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Matthew Q. Verdin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/9/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Emily Johnson Henn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/9/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Eric C. Bosset to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/9/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Matthew Q. Verdin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7386384) by FULLSTORY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew Q. Verdin in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Verdin, Matthew)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Emily Johnson Henn to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7386373) by FULLSTORY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Emily Johnson Henn in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Henn, Emily)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Eric C. Bosset to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7386343) by FULLSTORY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric C. Bosset in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Bosset, Eric)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Wolff on behalf of FULLSTORY, INC.. (Wolff, Peter)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by FULLSTORY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order) (Raiola, Stephen)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEF in Support re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by FULLSTORY, INC. (Raiola, Stephen)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by FULLSTORY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order) (Raiola, Stephen). Added MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on 11/21/2022 (ctb).
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Francis Raiola on behalf of FULLSTORY, INC.. (Raiola, Stephen)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by FULLSTORY, INC. Answer due from FULLSTORY, INC. on 11/7/2022. (Imbroscio, Michael)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying "None" as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FULLSTORY, INC.. (Imbroscio, Michael)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael X. Imbroscio on behalf of FULLSTORY, INC.. (Imbroscio, Michael)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KENNETH HASSON. FULLSTORY, INC. served on 9/2/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (Lynch, Gary)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (cjo)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/30/22. (cjo)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FULLSTORY, INC. (ctb)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FULLSTORY, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7265995), filed by KENNETH HASSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ctb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HASSON v. FULLSTORY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH HASSON
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Elizabeth Pollock-Avery
Represented By: Jamisen A. Etzel
Represented By: Kelly K. Iverson
Represented By: Nicholas Colella
Represented By: Patrick D. Donathen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULLSTORY, INC.
Represented By: Michael X. Imbroscio
Represented By: Emily Henn
Represented By: Eric C. Bosset
Represented By: Matthew Verdin
Represented By: Peter S. Wolff
Represented By: Stephen Francis Raiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?