GLAGOLA v. MACFANN et al
Plaintiff: ALYSSIA GLAGOLA
Defendant: WALTER MACFANN, TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P. and AMW CONSULTING, LLC,
Case Number: 2:2022cv01263
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Referring Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Filing 27 REPLY to #26 Response in Opposition, filed by AMW CONSULTING, LLC,, WALTER MACFANN, TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P. (Lattanzio, Kara)
December 26, 2022 Filing 26 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by ALYSSIA GLAGOLA. (Kayes, Thomas)
December 6, 2022 Filing 25 BRIEF in Support re #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AMW CONSULTING, LLC,, WALTER MACFANN, TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lattanzio, Kara)
December 6, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AMW CONSULTING, LLC,, WALTER MACFANN, TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Lattanzio, Kara)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER STRIKING the (ECF No. #22 ) Motion to Dismiss for failure to comply with the (ECF No. #8 ) Order entered September 7, 2022, and for failure to comply with Judge Lenihan's Practices and Procedures (located on the Court's external website) at Rule II.B. requiring that dispositive motions be accompanied by a separately filed supporting brief as follows: Motions seeking substantive legal ruling(s), whether dispositive or non-dispositive, should be accompanied by a supporting brief. The supporting brief must be filed contemporaneously with the motion. A brief may be omitted only if: (i) the motion is nondispositive, and (ii) the motion itself contains sufficient arguments and legal citation to permit meaningful judicial review. (emphasis added). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 12/06/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
December 2, 2022 Filing 22 STRICKEN per Order 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AMW CONSULTING, LLC,, WALTER MACFANN, TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Lattanzio, Kara) Modified on 12/6/2022 (cww).
November 18, 2022 Filing 21 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by ALYSSIA GLAGOLA. (Kayes, Thomas)
November 4, 2022 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AMW CONSULTING, LLC,, TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P.. (Lattanzio, Kara)
November 3, 2022 Filing 19 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by AMW CONSULTING, LLC,, WALTER MACFANN, TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P.. (Lattanzio, Kara)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than November 23, 2022. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Any party who has filed a Consent to Trial by a Magistrate Judge or District Judge form does not need to refile it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/02/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb)
October 27, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME by AMW CONSULTING, LLC,, WALTER MACFANN, TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P. (Lattanzio, Kara)
October 24, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #16 Notice of Appearance, #15 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: AMW CONSULTING LLC and TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P. did not file disclosure statements as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 10/31/2022. (jv)
October 21, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Hardin, II on behalf of AMW CONSULTING, LLC,, WALTER MACFANN, TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P.. (Hardin, Kenneth)
October 21, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara A. Lattanzio on behalf of AMW CONSULTING, LLC,, WALTER MACFANN, TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P.. (Lattanzio, Kara)
October 21, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. McDonnell on behalf of WALTER MACFANN. (McDonnell, Thomas)
October 11, 2022 Filing 13 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by WALTER MACFANN Answer due from WALTER MACFANN on 11/21/2022. (Patterson, Anthony)
October 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony E. Patterson on behalf of WALTER MACFANN. (Patterson, Anthony)
September 9, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMW CONSULTING, LLC,, WALTER MACFANN, TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P., filed by ALYSSIA GLAGOLA. (Kayes, Thomas)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING the (ECF No. #4 ) Motion to Strike, Seal or Redact Final Page of ECF No. #1 to the extent the that (ECF No. #1 ) Complaint is STRICKEN FROM THE DOCKET. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall re-file the complaint in this matter no later than September 9, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/08/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING the #3 Motion for Thomas R. Kayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/07/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/07/2022. (jmb)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 9/7/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lyk)
September 7, 2022 Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan added. (av)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/6/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lyk)
September 6, 2022 Unassigned no longer assigned to case. (av)
September 6, 2022 Judge David S. Cercone added. (av)
September 2, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Order re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ALYSSIA GLAGOLA. (Kayes, Thomas)
September 2, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike, Seal, or Redact Final Page of ECF No. 1 by ALYSSIA GLAGOLA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kayes, Thomas)
September 2, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Thomas R. Kayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7274654) by ALYSSIA GLAGOLA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas R. Kayes, #2 Exhibit to Affidavit) (Kayes, Thomas)
September 2, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AMW CONSULTING, LLC,, WALTER MACFANN (Main Document), TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Tri-County Realty Associates L.P., #2 Summons issued as to AMW Consulting LLC) (jv)
September 2, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (jv)
September 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMW CONSULTING, LLC,, WALTER MACFANN, TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7273349), filed by ALYSSIA GLAGOLA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLAGOLA v. MACFANN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALYSSIA GLAGOLA
Represented By: Thomas Kayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER MACFANN
Represented By: Anthony E. Patterson
Represented By: Kara A. Lattanzio
Represented By: Kenneth J. Hardin, II
Represented By: Thomas A. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRI-COUNTY REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Represented By: Kara A. Lattanzio
Represented By: Kenneth J. Hardin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMW CONSULTING, LLC,
Represented By: Kara A. Lattanzio
Represented By: Kenneth J. Hardin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?