FREDERICK v. ACOSTA SALES CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: LEROY FREDERICK
Defendant: ACOSTA SALES CO., INC. and MOSAIC SALES SOLUTIONS US OPERATING CO.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01350
Filed: September 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christy Criswell Wiegand
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that, in light of #31 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 7/14/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
July 13, 2023 Filing 31 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by LEROY FREDERICK. (Dunlap, Andrew)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #29 Joint Status Report by LEROY FREDERICK. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report regarding settlement on or before 7/13/2023. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 6/14/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
June 13, 2023 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT by LEROY FREDERICK. (Dunlap, Andrew)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #27 Joint Status Report by LEROY FREDERICK. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report regarding the status of the parties' arbitration on or before 6/13/2023 or within 3 days of completion of arbitration, whichever is sooner. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 4/13/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
April 11, 2023 Filing 27 STATUS REPORT by LEROY FREDERICK. (Dunlap, Andrew)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #23 Motion to Compel Arbitration. In light of Plaintiff LEROY FREDERICK's #25 Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Compel is GRANTED and the parties shall arbitrate their dispute consistent with their arbitration agreement. This case is stayed and administratively closed pending further order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report regarding the status of the parties' arbitration on or before 4/11/2023 or within 3 days of completion of arbitration, whichever is sooner. Clerk is to mark case CLOSED. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 2/10/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
February 9, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration by LEROY FREDERICK re #23 Motion to Compel (Dunlap, Andrew)
February 2, 2023 Filing 24 BRIEF in Support re #23 Motion to Compel filed by ACOSTA SALES CO., INC., MOSAIC SALES SOLUTIONS US OPERATING CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Presley, Marla)
February 2, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by ACOSTA SALES CO., INC., MOSAIC SALES SOLUTIONS US OPERATING CO.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Presley, Marla)
January 10, 2023 Filing 22 REPORT of Mediation: Case has not resolved. Errata - Corrected Docket Number on Mediator's Report The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed #here or at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 12/9/2022. Mediation Conference set for 12/9/2022 09:00 AM (Russell, Michael)
December 30, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #21 Report of Mediation. ERROR: Case number of document does not match case number of case. CORRECTION: Attorney is directed to file an Errata with corrected case number. (dmh)
December 29, 2022 Filing 21 REPORT of Mediation: Case has not resolved. Michael L. Russell terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed #here or at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 12/9/2022. Mediation Conference set for 12/9/2022 09:00 AM (Russell, Michael)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Michael Russell is appointed as mediator. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 11/28/2022. (jmm)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 11/30/2022; Motion to Add New Parties and/or Amend Pleadings due by 12/30/2022; ADR to be completed by 12/9/2022; Discovery related to Class Certification due by 2/17/2023; Defendants' Notice re an expert witness due by 2/17/2023; Defendants' expert report disclosure due by 3/17/2023; Parties' Expert Discovery to be completed by 3/31/2023. If Defendants will not call an expert witness: Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification due by 3/10/2023; Defendants' response to the Motion due by 3/31/2023; Plaintiff's reply due by 4/7/2023. If Defendants will call an expert witness: Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification due by 4/17//2023; Defendants' response to the Motion due by 5/8/2023; Plaintiff's reply due by 5/15/2023 as more fully set forth by said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 11/15/2022. (jmm)
November 15, 2022 Filing 18 Minute Entry for Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand held on 11/15/2022. (Court Reporter: None) (jmm)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Robert William Gignilliat, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 11/8/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
November 8, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by ACOSTA SALES CO., INC., MOSAIC SALES SOLUTIONS US OPERATING CO.. (Presley, Marla)
November 8, 2022 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Presley, Marla)
November 7, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Wm. Robert Gignilliat, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7382279) by ACOSTA SALES CO., INC., MOSAIC SALES SOLUTIONS US OPERATING CO.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Service Order) (Gignilliat, William)
October 28, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Town on behalf of ACOSTA SALES CO., INC., MOSAIC SALES SOLUTIONS US OPERATING CO.. (Town, Emily)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2022 at 9:00 AM via Telephonic Conference before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 11/1/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report and ADR Stipulation due by 11/8/2022. Confidential Position Letters due by 11/10/2022. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 10/13/2022. (jmm)
October 12, 2022 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ACOSTA SALES CO., INC., MOSAIC SALES SOLUTIONS US OPERATING CO.. (Presley, Marla)
October 12, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by ACOSTA SALES CO., INC., MOSAIC SALES SOLUTIONS US OPERATING CO.. (Presley, Marla)
September 30, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of LEROY FREDERICK. (Dunlap, Andrew)
September 30, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Josephson on behalf of LEROY FREDERICK. (Josephson, Michael)
September 28, 2022 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ACOSTA SALES CO., INC., MOSAIC SALES SOLUTIONS US OPERATING CO. Answer due from ACOSTA SALES CO., INC. on 10/12/2022; MOSAIC SALES SOLUTIONS US OPERATING CO. on 10/12/2022. (Presley, Marla)
September 28, 2022 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jmm)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 9/28/2022. (jmm)
September 28, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm)
September 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD22-005681 with Jury Demand. Copies attached: Class Action Complaint; Praecipe to Reinstate Complaint; Affidavit of Service; Notice of Filing of Petition for Removal (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7306734), filed by ACOSTA SALES CO., INC., MOSAIC SALES SOLUTIONS US OPERATING CO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (dmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREDERICK v. ACOSTA SALES CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEROY FREDERICK
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Joshua P. Geist
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: Travis Andrew Gasper
Represented By: William F. Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACOSTA SALES CO., INC.
Represented By: Marla N. Presley
Represented By: Robert William Gignilliat, IV
Represented By: Emily E. Town
Represented By: William Robert Gignilliat, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOSAIC SALES SOLUTIONS US OPERATING CO.
Represented By: Marla N. Presley
Represented By: Robert William Gignilliat, IV
Represented By: Emily E. Town
Represented By: William Robert Gignilliat, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?